Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969697

EP0969697 - A hearing aid [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.07.2002
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.08.2002  [2002/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GN Resound Limited
1 Weston Business Park Weston on the Green
Oxfordshire OX6 8SY / GB
For all designated states
Resound Deutschland GmbH
Dieckstrasse 57
48145 Münster / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/37]For all designated states
GN Resound Limited
1 Weston Business Park
Weston on the Green, Oxfordshire OX6 8SY / GB
For all designated states
Resound Deutschland GmbH
Dieckstrasse 57
48145 Münster / DE
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
Resound Viennatone Ltd.
1 Weston Business Park
Weston on the Green, Oxfordshire OX6 8SY / GB
For all designated states
Resound Deutschland GmbH
Dieckstrasse 57
48145 Münster / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Martin, Reginald
14 Titchener Close
Bicester, Oxfordshire OX6 8BZ / GB
02 / Henneboel, Uwe
Holzweg 14
59597 Erwitte / DE
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Ertl, Nicholas Justin , et al
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/52]Ertl, Nicholas Justin , et al
Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Former [2000/01]Finnie, Peter John
Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Application number, filing date99304358.703.06.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateGB1998001194703.06.1998         Original published format: GB 9811947
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0969697
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0969697
Date:06.02.2002
[2002/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.12.2001
ClassificationInternational:H04R25/00
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/01]
Extension statesAL07.09.1999
LT07.09.1999
LV07.09.1999
MK07.09.1999
RO07.09.1999
SI07.09.1999
TitleGerman:Hörhilfegerät[2000/01]
English:A hearing aid[2000/01]
French:Prothèse auditive[2000/01]
Examination procedure01.01.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/34]
07.03.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/34]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200103   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]WO9607295  (ARGOSY ELECTRONICS INC) [X] 1-4,6-14 * page 1, lines 1-3 * * page 3, lines 4-30 * * page 7, line 14 - page 14, line 19 * [A] 5;
 [XA]US5359321  (RIBIC ZLATAN) [X] 1-4,12,13 * column 1, lines 9-14 * * column 2, lines 3-60 * * column 3, line 47 - column 4, line 12 * [A] 5-11,14;
 [A]US4679240  (HEIDE JORGEN) [A] 1,5,6,11 * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 27 * * column 2, line 56 - column 5, line 2 *