Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968715

EP0968715 - Loratadine for use as an antiarrhymthmic [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.07.2005
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.08.2005  [2005/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pfizer Products Inc.
Eastern Point Road
Groton, CT 06340-5146 / US
[2000/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Buckland, Guy
16 River Lane
Cos Cob, Connecticut 06807 / US
02 / Friedrich, Tilman
14 Atlantic Avenue
Groton Long Point, Connecticut 06340 / US
03 / Satler, Carol Ann
201 Newbury Street, No 507
Boston, Massachusetts 02116 / US
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Watkins, David , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord
30 Welbeck Street
London W1G 8ER / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Watkins, David , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, 91 Wimpole Street
London W1M 8AH / GB
Application number, filing date99304375.104.06.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateUS19980091246P30.06.1998         Original published format: US 91246 P
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968715
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968715
Date:01.09.2004
Language:EN
[2004/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/445
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/37]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Loratadin zur Verwendung als Antiarrhythmikum[2000/01]
English:Loratadine for use as an antiarrhymthmic[2000/01]
French:Loratadine à utiliser comme agents antiarrhythmique[2000/01]
Examination procedure16.06.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
01.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.02.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.06.2004Fee for grant paid
28.06.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.06.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
04.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
19.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
26.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9620708  (SEPRACOR INC) [A] 7-11 * page 24, line 28 - page 25, line 36; claims 2,9,16,23,29,35,42 *;
 [A]  - HARIA M ET AL, "LORATADINE. A REAPPRAISAL OT ITS PHARMACOLOGICAL PROPERTIES AND THERAPEUTIC USE IN ALLERGIC DISORDERS", DRUGS, (19940101), vol. 48, no. 4, ISSN 0012-6667, pages 617 - 637, XP000604036 [A] 1-6 * page 624, column L, line 42 - page 625, column L, line 26 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2165/00003495-199448040-00009