Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0964245

EP0964245 - Electrochemical analysis element [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  29.06.2007
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2008Change - applicantpublished on 19.11.2008  [2008/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[2008/47]
Former [1999/50]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Ohaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yoshioka, Toshihiko
15-15-307, Takatsuka-cho
Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0035 / JP
02 / Ikeda, Shin
2-5-16-205, Fujigao
Katano-shi, Osaka 576-0022 / JP
03 / Watanabe, Motokazu
25-3, Midou-cho
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-0064 / JP
04 / Nankai, Shiro
4-50-12, Nasuzukuri
Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0071 / JP
[1999/50]
Representative(s)Price, Paul Anthony King , et al
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/50]Price, Paul Anthony King , et al
D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date99304400.707.06.1999
[1999/50]
Priority number, dateJP1998016337511.06.1998         Original published format: JP 16337598
[1999/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0964245
Date:15.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0964245
Date:20.09.2000
[2000/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:G01N27/28, C12Q1/00, G01N33/487
[2000/38]
Former International [1999/50]G01N27/28, C12Q1/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/23]
Former [1999/50]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Elektrochemische Analyseelement[1999/50]
English:Electrochemical analysis element[1999/50]
French:Elément d'analyse électrochimique[1999/50]
Examination procedure28.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/17]
12.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.10.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
29.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.06.2007Application withdrawn by applicant  [2007/31]
27.07.2007Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:29.12.2004Request for further processing filed
23.12.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.01.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
07.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
04.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
03.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
02.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
19.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
14.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[X]US5437999  (DIEBOLD ERIC R [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 8, line 12 - line 60; figures 5,6 * * column 2, line 7 - line 40 * * column 12, line 18 - column 13, line 16 *;
 [XY]JPS612060  ;
 [XY]EP0795601  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3,4 * column 1, line 14 - column 3, line 46; figures 1,2 * [Y] 5;
 [X]EP0590661  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3,4 * abstract *;
 [X]EP0351891  (MEDISENSE INC [US]) [X] 1-4 * page 2, line 54 - page 5, line 9; figures 11,15 * * page 12, line 53 - page 13, line 4 *;
 [X]JPS60244853  ;
 [X]GB2254436  (WILSON ROBERT) [X] 1,3,5 * page 2, line 8 - page 3, line 33; figure 1 * * page 5, lines 9,16 * * page 5, line 30 - page 6, line 8 * * page 7, line 33 - line 34; claims 6,8 *;
 [X]US4966671  (NYLANDER CLAES I [SE], et al) [X] 1,5 * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 2; figure 1 * * column 4, line 3 - column 5, line 21 *;
 [YA]EP0811838  (AKEBONO BRAKE IND [JP], et al) [Y] 5 * page 10, line 49 - page 11, line 6; figure 5 * * page 7, line 50 - page 8, line 10 * [A] 3;
 [PX]EP0872728  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1,3,4,6 * column 4, line 13 - line 18; figures 1-4 * * column 5, line 48 - line 50 * * column 6, line 31 - line 33 *;
 [X]EP0226470  (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1,6 * column 3, line 12 - line 60; figures 1-3 * * column 7, line 30 - line 37 * * column 8, line 63 - column 9, line 42 * * column 10, line 17 - line 22; claims 10,11 *;
 [X]US5705045  (PARK JE-KYUN [KR], et al) [X] 1,6 * column 7, line 17 - line 41; figures 5-7 * * column 8, line 23 - line 43 * * column 9, line 13 - line 30 *;
 [Y]DE19546535  (INST CHEMO BIOSENSORIK [DE]) [Y] 6 * column 1, line 21 - line 25 * * column 7, line 48 - line 49 * * column 8, line 66 - column 9, line 2 * * column 10, line 65 - column 11, line 19 * * column 13, line 68 - column 14, line 1; figures 3,4 *
 [XY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860530), vol. 010, no. 149, Database accession no. (P - 461), & JP61002060 A 19860108 (MATSUSHITA DENKO KK) [X] 1,2,4 * abstract * [Y] 6
    [] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1986, no. 08, Database accession no. 1986-050505 [ ] * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860430), vol. 010, no. 116, Database accession no. (P - 452), & JP60244853 A 19851204 (MATSUSHITA DENKO KK) [X] 1,2,4 * abstract *
    [] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1986, no. 04, Database accession no. 1986-023843 [ ] * abstract *