Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972825

EP0972825 - Pellet formulations [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.03.2003
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.04.2003  [2003/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY
100 Independence Mall West
Philadelphia, PA 19106-2399 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY
100 Independence Mall West
Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19106-2399 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Duccini, Yves
45 Rue du Caurroy
6000 Beauvais / FR
02 / Gauthier, Francois
8 Allee de la Source
60550 Verneuil en Halatte / FR
03 / Tatin, Johan
7 rue Edouard Branly, Appt No. 10
60200 Compiegne / FR
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Burne, Carole Amanda , et al
Rohm and Haas (UK) Limited European Operations Patent Dept., Lennig House, 2 Mason's Avenue
Croydon, Surrey CR9 3NB / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Davis, Carole Amanda , et al
Rohm and Haas (UK) Limited European Operations Patent Dept., Lennig House, 2 Mason's Avenue
Croydon, Surrey CR9 3NB / GB
Application number, filing date99304428.808.06.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateFR1998000764317.06.1998         Original published format: FR 9807643
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0972825
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0972825
Date:23.02.2000
[2000/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0972825
Date:02.05.2002
Language:EN
[2002/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:C11D17/00, C11D3/37, A61K9/20, C02F5/08
[2000/08]
Former International [2000/03]C11D17/00, C11D3/37
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/44]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Teilchenförmige Zusammensetzungen[2000/03]
English:Pellet formulations[2000/03]
French:Compositions en forme boulette[2000/03]
Examination procedure21.06.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
22.11.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
31.01.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
31.01.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
23.04.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
06.11.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.11.2001Fee for grant paid
19.11.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.02.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL02.05.2002
[2003/09]
Documents cited:Search[X]US4673527  (GOUDY JR PAUL R [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 56 *;
 [X]EP0313328  (APS RES LTD [GB]) [X] 1-10 * page 4, line 48 - page 5, line 2 *;
 [A]GB1376212  (SAREA AG) [A] 1-10 * page 2, line 41 - line 64 *;
 [PA]WO9845400  (BENCKISER NV [NL], et al) [PA] 1-10 * claims 1-4 *
 [DA]  LOWENTHAL W, "Disintegration of Tablets", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (19721101), vol. 61, no. 11, pages 1695 - 1711, XP002126338 [DA] 1-10 * page 1697, line 13 - line 45 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600611102