Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970933

EP0970933 - Slow release matrix bound fertilisers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.01.2004
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.03.2004  [2004/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ureka Ltd. (formerly Brycliff Ltd.)
Hart House, 6 London Road St. Albans
Herts AL1 1NG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
Ureka Ltd. (formerly Brycliff Ltd.)
Hart House, 6 London Road
St. Albans, Herts AL1 1NG / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Alderson, Philip
15 Scardale, Heelands
Milton Keynes, MK13 7ND / GB
02 / Arcibald, Gordon
Willowbank, 18A Farm Lane
Tonbridge, Kent, TN10 3DG / GB
03 / Beckwith, David
3 Aldenham Road
Radlett, Herts, WD7 8AV / GB
04 / Treacy, Kevin
1 Windsor Mews
Malahide, Co. Dublin, Eire / GB
[2000/02]
Application number, filing date99304490.809.06.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateGB1998001231009.06.1998         Original published format: GB 9812310
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0970933
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0970933
Date:12.07.2000
[2000/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:C05F9/00, C05F7/00
[2000/27]
Former International [2000/02]C05F9/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/12]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Matrizengebundener Düngemittelstoff mit verzögerter Wirkstoffabgabe[2000/02]
English:Slow release matrix bound fertilisers[2000/02]
French:Matrice contenant des engrais á liberation retardée[2000/02]
Examination procedure11.07.2000Examination requested  [2001/03]
13.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.03.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.09.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.08.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/11]
16.09.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
06.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200103   M06   Fee paid on   18.12.2001
30.06.200204   M06   Fee paid on   06.12.2002
30.06.200305   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9529884  (FERTILIZER PRODUCTION MACHINER [US]) [X] 1-11 * claim - * * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 17 * * page 3, line 31 - page 7, line 14 *;
 [X]EP0428015  (RELAND IND INC [US]) [X] 1-11 * claim - * * column 2, line 25 - column 7, line 17 *;
 [X]US4743287  (ROBINSON ELMO C [US]) [X] 1-11 * claim - * * column 2, line 46 - column 3, line 56 * * column 4, line 50 - column 6, line 9 * * column 8, line 50 - column 9, line 54 *