Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974993

EP0974993 - Electrical switchgear with synchronous control system and actuator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.07.2004
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip16.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.09.2004  [2004/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cooper Industries, Inc.
600 Travis, Suite 5800
Houston, Texas 77002 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Cooper Industries, Inc.
600 Travis, Suite 5800
Houston, Texas 77002 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Dunk, Michael Peter
12332 6 1/2 Mile Road
Caledonia, Wisconsin 53108 / US
02 / Baranowski, John Francis
7701 West Coventry Drive
Franklin, Wisconsin 53132 / US
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Brunner, Michael John
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Brunner, Michael John
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date99304501.209.06.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateUS1998010437725.06.1998         Original published format: US 104377
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0974993
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0974993
Date:12.07.2000
[2000/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01H33/59, H01H11/00
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB [2001/12]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Elektrisches Schaltgerät mit synchronem Steuersystem[2000/04]
English:Electrical switchgear with synchronous control system and actuator[2000/04]
French:Appareil de commutation avec système de commande synchrone[2000/04]
Examination procedure15.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/06]
12.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/36]
31.03.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
07.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
04.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
04.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9636982  (MCCORMICK GARRETT P ;COOPER IND INC (US); DUNK MICHAEL P (US)) [X] 1,4,7,9,11,14,17,19,20,22,23,25,26,29,30,32,34,35,37 * the whole document * [Y] 8,12,13,15,24,27,28,36;
 [Y]DE3224165  (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE) [Y] 12,27 * page 16, line 14 - page 17, line 6; figure 4 *;
 [Y]WO9201303  (SIEMENS AG) [Y] 13,28 * abstract *;
 [Y]FR2488036  (LANDIS & GYR AG) [Y] 15 * page 3, line 22 - line 26 *;
 [A]US5638296  (JOHNSON DAVID S ET AL) [A] 2,3,5,6,18,21,31,33 * column 10, line 25 - line 58 * * column 19, line 12 - column 20, line 36; figures 6A,6B *
 [Y]  - PASSEY D A ET AL, "ARC SUPPRESSION OF A DC ENERGIZED CONTACTOR UNDER INDUCTIVE LOAD", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, (19851101), vol. IA-21, no. 6, ISSN 0093-9994, pages 1354 - 1359, XP000575284 [Y] 8,24,36 * the whole document *