Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0964194

EP0964194 - Relief valve [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.08.2005
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.08.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.10.2005  [2005/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Kawasaki Precision Machinery
234 Matsumoto, Hasetani-cho, Nishi-ku
Kobe 651-2239 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2004/02]For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Kawasaki Precision Machinery
234 Matsumoto Hasetani-cho
Nishi-ku, Kobe 651-2239 / JP
Former [1999/50]For all designated states
Kawasaki Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
1-1 Higashikawasaki-cho, 3-chome, Chuo-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo 650-8670 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sagawa, Toyoaki
50-37, Karibadai 1-chome, Nishi-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-2272 / JP
02 / Matsuo, Masahiro
32, Kawasaki-cho 2-chome
Akashi-shi, Hyogo 673-0014 / JP
03 / Yamamoto, Ryo
2-17, Kasugadai 6-chome, Nishi-ku
Kobe-shi 651-2276 / JP
[1999/50]
Representative(s)Milhench, Howard Leslie , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/50]Milhench, Howard Leslie , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date99304543.410.06.1999
[1999/50]
Priority number, dateJP1998016481312.06.1998         Original published format: JP 16481398
[1999/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0964194
Date:15.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0964194
Date:11.04.2001
[2001/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0964194
Date:20.10.2004
Language:EN
[2004/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP22.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:F16K17/04, F16K17/08, F16K17/06
[2001/15]
Former International [1999/50]F16K17/04, F16K17/08
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/01]
Former [1999/50]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Überdruckventil[1999/50]
English:Relief valve[1999/50]
French:Soupape de surpression[1999/50]
Examination procedure27.07.2001Examination requested  [2001/38]
04.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.04.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.08.2004Fee for grant paid
20.08.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.07.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XA]US4463929  (DANTLGRABER JOERG [DE], et al) [X] 10 * column 3, line 31 - line 37 * * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 52 * * figure . * [A] 1;
 [A]EP0158776  (DRAEGERWERK AG [DE]) [A] 1,10 * abstract * * figure . *;
 [A]DE1959775U  (PLEIGER MASCHF PAUL [DE]) [A] 1,10 * page 4, line 36 - line 19 * * figure . *
by applicantJPH0723663Y