Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968893

EP0968893 - Vehicle brake control [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.07.2003
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip28.08.2009Change - representativepublished on 30.09.2009  [2009/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Land Rover Group Limited
Banbury Road Lighthorne
Warwick CV35 0RG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/21]For all designated states
Land Rover Group Limited
Banbury Road
Lighthorne, Warwick CV35 0RG / GB
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
ROVER GROUP LIMITED
International Headquarters, Warwick Technology Park
Warwick, Warwickshire CV34 6RG / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Guest, Philip John
16 Tidmington Close, Hatton Park
Warwick CV35 7TE / GB
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Farrow, Robert Michael , et al
Land Rover Patent Department (53G16/4) Banbury Road Lightthorne
Warwickshire CV35 0RG / GB
[2009/40]
Former [2002/28]Farrow, Robert Michael , et al
Land Rover Patent Department (53W5/12) Warwick Technology Park
Warwick CV34 6RG / GB
Former [2001/21]Farrow, Robert Michael , et al
Land Rover, Gaydon Engineering Centre, 53/G/9/1, Banbury Road
Lighthorne, Warwick CV35 ORG / GB
Former [2000/01]Wilson, Alan Stuart , et al
Rover Group Limited, Patent Department, Gaydon Test Centre, Banbury Road
Lighthorne, Warwick CV35 0RG / GB
Application number, filing date99304565.711.06.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateGB1998001425802.07.1998         Original published format: GB 9814258
[2002/35]
Former [2000/01]GB1998001459102.07.1998
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0968893
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0968893
Date:28.02.2001
[2001/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968893
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.01.2001
ClassificationInternational:B60T8/00, B60T13/68
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   ES,   FR,   IT [2002/35]
Former [2002/11]AT,  DE,  ES,  FR,  IT,  SE 
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Bremssteuervorrichtung[2000/01]
English:Vehicle brake control[2000/01]
French:Dispositif de commande de frein[2000/01]
Examination procedure25.08.2001Examination requested  [2001/43]
20.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
21.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
30.01.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.04.2002Fee for grant paid
24.04.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
17.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[AD]WO9611826  (ROVER GROUP [GB], et al) [AD] 1,4-6 * page 8, line 20 - page 9, line 13 *;
 [E]EP0983894  (ROVER GROUP [GB]) [E] 1-6 * paragraph [0016]; figure 2 *;
 [E]EP0979762  (WABCO GMBH [DE]) [E] 1-3,5 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0028] * * figure 4; claims 1,5 *
by applicantWO9611826