Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969523

EP0969523 - Process for producing a photovoltaic device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/01]Photovoltaic device and process for producing the same
[2005/13]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.07.2006
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.08.2006  [2006/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22, Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2005/35]For all designated states
SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA
22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 545-8522 / JP
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kishimoto, Katsushi
B101, 4-11-12 Seyahigashi, Sango-cho
Ikoma-gun, Nara 636-0811 / JP
02 / Nakano, Takanori
319, 192-1 Hajikami, Shinjo-cho
Kitakatsuragi-gun, Nara 639-2122 / JP
03 / Sannomiya, Hitoshi
3-18-11 Minamitanabe, Higashisumiyoshi-ku
Osaki-shi, Osaka 546-0033 / JP
04 / Nomoto, Katsuhiko
1-12-41 Hirano
Kashihara-shi, Osaka 582-0019 / JP
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Brown, Kenneth Richard , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Brown, Kenneth Richard , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date99304582.211.06.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateJP1998016532912.06.1998         Original published format: JP 16532998
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0969523
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0969523
Date:05.07.2000
[2000/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0969523
Date:31.08.2005
Language:EN
[2005/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01L31/075, H01L31/20
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/11]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung einer photovoltaischen Vorrichtung[2005/13]
English:Process for producing a photovoltaic device[2005/13]
French:Procédé pour la fabrication d'un dispositif photovoltaique[2005/13]
Former [2000/01]Photovoltaische Vorrichtung und ihr Herstellungsverfahren
Former [2000/01]Photovoltaic device and process for producing the same
Former [2000/01]Dispositif photovoltaique et son procédé de fabrication
Examination procedure13.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/45]
06.01.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
26.04.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
02.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.02.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.06.2005Fee for grant paid
20.06.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.06.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
14.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
02.02.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
02.02.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
02.02.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
02.02.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
02.02.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
02.02.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
02.02.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
02.02.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
02.02.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
02.02.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
02.02.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
02.02.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
02.02.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
02.02.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
02.02.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4705912  (NAKASHIMA YUKIO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,7,8,12-14 * the whole document * [Y] 9;
 [Y]EP0024378  (THOMSON CSF [FR]) [Y] 9 * the whole document *;
 [XA]US4737196  (YUKIMOTO YOSHINORI [JP]) [X] 1,2,7,14 * the whole document * [A] 4;
 [XA]EP0747974  (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,14 * page 6, line 40 - page 9, line 42 * * page 14, line 15 - page 16, line 24 * * examples 1,6,16,26,34 * [A] 4,5,7,13;
 [XA]US4721535  (ITOH HARUO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,7,8,12,14 * the whole document * [A] 4;
 [X]US4718947  (ARYA RAJEEWA R [US]) [X] 1,2,14 * column 3, line 33 - column 6, line 10 *;
 [XA]EP0828301  (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 14 * page 8, lines 10-45; examples 1,3 * [A] 1,4,6,7,13
ExaminationUS5419783
 US4612559
 EP0122778