Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0965934

EP0965934 - Data management and communication system for a domestic environment [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.07.2006
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.08.2006  [2006/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NCR INTERNATIONAL INC.
1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton
Ohio 45479 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/51]For all designated states
NCR INTERNATIONAL INC.
1700 South Patterson Boulevard
Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Emmott, Stephen J.
103 Millenium Tower, 65 Hopton Street
London SE1 9JL / GB
02 / Woods, Sarah
Klipperke, Grosvenor Dock, Gatliff Road
London SW1W 8QR / GB
[1999/51]
Representative(s)Williamson, Brian , et al
NCR Limited International Patent Department 206 Marylebone Road London
NW1 6LY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/50]Williamson, Brian , et al
NCR Limited International Patent Department 206 Marylebone Road
London NW1 6LY / GB
Former [2004/35]Williamson, Brian , et al
Barker Bretell 10-12 Priests Bridge
London SW15 5JE / GB
Former [1999/51]Cleary, Fidelma , et al
International IP Department NCR Limited 206 Marylebone Road
London NW1 6LY / GB
Application number, filing date99304596.214.06.1999
[1999/51]
Priority number, dateGB1998001319118.06.1998         Original published format: GB 9813191
GB1998001931604.09.1998         Original published format: GB 9819316
[1999/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0965934
Date:22.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/51]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0965934
Date:09.02.2000
[2000/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP28.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/60
[1999/51]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/42]
Former [1999/51]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Datenverwaltungs- und Kommunikationssystem für eine häusliche Umgebung[1999/51]
English:Data management and communication system for a domestic environment[1999/51]
French:Système de gestion et de communication de données pour un environement domestique[1999/51]
Examination procedure09.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/41]
02.07.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/32]
13.02.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2006/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
01.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200507   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0837599  (NEXTLEVEL SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1,6 * abstract * * page 8, line 9 - line 41; figure 3 *;
 [A]US4533948  (MCNAMARA ROBERT P [US], et al) [A] 1,5-7 * column 1, line 1 - line 24 *;
 [A]WO9824040  (NCR INT INC [US], et al) [A] 1,5 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph 6 - page 5, paragraph 4; figures 1,2 *
 [X]  LEWIS T, "INFORMATION APPLIANCES: GADGET NETOPIA", COMPUTER,US,IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY, LONG BEACH., CA, US, vol. 31, no. 1, ISSN 0018-9162, page 59-68, XP000737920 [X] 1-11 * abstract * * page 59, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 59, column 1, line 1 - page 63, column 2, line 9 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/2.641978
 [X]  GOLDBERG L, "INFORMATION APPLIANCES: FROM WEB PHONES TO SMART REFRIGERATORS", ELECTRONIC DESIGN,US,PENTON PUBLISHING, CLEVELAND, OH, vol. 46, no. 7, ISSN 0013-4872, page 69-70,74,76,78, XP000780456 [X] 1-11 * page 69, column 1, line 1 - page 70, column 1, line 27 * * page 76, column 3, line 5 - line 23 * * page 80, column 1, line 1 - column 3, line 4 *
 [A]  LAWTON G, "DAWN OF THE INTERNET APPLIANCE", COMPUTER,US,IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY, LONG BEACH., CA, US, vol. 30, no. 10, ISSN 0018-9162, page 16,18, XP000738076 [A] 1 * the whole document *
 [A]  DAVID KLINE, "The embedded Internet", WIRED, vol. 4, no. 10, (19961031), URL: http://wired.lycos.com/wired/archive/4.10/es_embedded_pr.html, (19991208), XP002125117 [A] 1 * page 1, paragraph 6 - paragraph 7 * * page 2, paragraph 13 * * page 3, paragraph 13 *