EP0971445 - Encircled electrical compression contact [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.12.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.02.2004 [2004/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rugg, William c/o WR Limited, Inc., 3312 Meining Road Berthoud, CO 80513 / US | For all designated states Ranoda Electronics Pte Ltd 47 Loyang Drive Singapore 508955 AS PER 16 / SG | [N/P] |
Former [2000/02] | For all designated states Rugg, William c/o WR Limited, Inc., 3312 Meining Road Berthoud, CO 80513 / US | ||
For all designated states Ranoda Electronics Pte Ltd 47 Loyang Drive Sigapore 508955 AS PER 16 / SG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rugg, William c/o WR Limited, Inc., 3312 Meining Road Berthoud, CO 80513 / US | 02 /
Hor, Seah Ke 1 Jalan Hiboran Singapore 369068 / SG | [2000/12] |
Former [2000/02] | 01 /
Rugg, William c/o WR Limited, Inc., 3312 Meining Road Berthoud, CO 80513 / US | ||
02 /
Hor, Seah Ke 1 Jalan Hiboran Sigapore 369068 / SG | Representative(s) | Cummings, Sean Patrick, et al Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/02] | Cummings, Sean Patrick, et al David Keltie Associates, 12 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1AG / GB | Application number, filing date | 99304618.4 | 14.06.1999 | [2000/02] | Priority number, date | US19980109589 | 02.07.1998 Original published format: US 109589 | [2000/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0971445 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0971445 | Date: | 07.02.2001 | [2001/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01R12/34 | [2000/02] | CPC: |
H01R12/58 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL, SE [2001/43] |
Former [2000/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Umschlossener elektrischer Kompressionskontakt | [2000/02] | English: | Encircled electrical compression contact | [2000/02] | French: | Contact de compression électrique enfermé | [2000/02] | Examination procedure | 28.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/35] | 08.08.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, FI, GR, LI, LU, MC, PT | 16.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/06] | 02.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.09.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4676579 (TING TSE-WU [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,6 * the whole document * [Y] 3,4,7,8; | [YA]US5124883 (BAKKER ROEL J [US]) [Y] 3,4 * abstract * * column 2, lines 39-41 * [A] 7; | [YA]DE29614725U (EPT GUGLHOER PEITING GMBH & CO [DE]) [Y] 8 * figure 1 * [A] 1,9; | [Y]GB2248565 (SMITHS INDUSTRIES PLC [GB]) [Y] 7 * abstract *; | [A]US5427546 (GARRITANO MARIO [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 5,6 *; | [A]DE29704161U (FCT ELECTRONIC GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * |