EP0965889 - Overlay measurement technique using moire patterns [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2004 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/38] | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | ||
For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | |||
Former [1999/51] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Muller, Karl Paul 89 Brothers Road Wappingers Falls, NY 12590 / US | 02 /
Prakash, Ventakatachalam C. 39c Hudson View Drive Beacon, NY 12508 / US | 03 /
Gould, Christopher J. 386 Hicks Hill Road Stanfordville, NY 12581 / US | [1999/51] | Representative(s) | Litchfield, Laura Marie, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/51] | Litchfield, Laura Marie, et al Haseltine Lake & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 99304651.5 | 15.06.1999 | [1999/51] | Priority number, date | US19980097784 | 15.06.1998 Original published format: US 97784 | [1999/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0965889 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0965889 | Date: | 05.04.2000 | [2000/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G03F9/00, G03F7/20, H01L23/544 | [2000/14] | CPC: |
G03F7/70633 (EP,US);
H01L22/00 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1999/51] | G03F9/00, G03F7/20 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL [2000/50] |
Former [1999/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Messtechnik zur Bestimmung der Ausrichtung mittels Moiré-Motiven | [1999/51] | English: | Overlay measurement technique using moire patterns | [1999/51] | French: | Technique pour mesurer le recouvrement en utilisant des motifs à effet moiré | [1999/51] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/47] | 23.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 09.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Request for further processing for: | 15.12.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 30.12.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.01.2004 | Decision despatched | 09.09.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 09.09.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.10.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH07120221 ; | [A]JPH0260120 ; | [A]JPH03154803 ; | [A]US4568189 (BASS JOHN F [US], et al); | [A]EP0370834 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0534720 (LEVIEN RAPHAEL L [US]) [Y] 4 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2293026 (HYUNDAI ELECTRONICS IND [KR]) [A] * the whole document * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950929), vol. 1995, no. 08, & JP07120221 A 19950512 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-3 * abstract * [Y] 4 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900515), vol. 014, no. 229, Database accession no. (E - 0928), & JP02060120 A 19900228 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910927), vol. 015, no. 384, Database accession no. (P - 1258), & JP03154803 A 19910702 (TOSOH CORP) [A] * abstract * |