Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972537

EP0972537 - Medical fixation device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.03.2006
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2008Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 24.12.2008  [2008/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mogg, Alan David
44 Albert Road Ferndown
Dorset BH22 9HE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
Mogg, Alan David
44 Albert Road
Ferndown, Dorset BH22 9HE / GB
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Lomas, Geoffrey Michael , et al
Barker Brettell LLP Medina Chambers Town Quay Southampton
SO14 2AQ / GB
[2008/23]
Former [2000/03]Lomas, Geoffrey Michael , et al
Barker, Brettell & Boutland Medina Chambers Town Quay
Southampton, Hampshire SO14 2AQ / GB
Application number, filing date99304724.017.06.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateGB1998001305618.06.1998         Original published format: GB 9813056
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0972537
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0972537
Date:05.04.2000
[2000/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0972537
Date:18.05.2005
Language:EN
[2005/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP18.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61M25/02
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/52]
Former [2000/51]AT,  BE,  CH,  LI 
Former [2000/50](deleted) 
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Medizinische Fixierungsvorrichtung[2000/03]
English:Medical fixation device[2000/03]
French:Dispositif de fixation médical[2000/03]
Examination procedure03.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/51]
06.10.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
25.01.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
15.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.11.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.03.2005Fee for grant paid
02.03.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.02.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
07.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
04.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
03.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
20.11.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
20.11.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
20.11.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
20.11.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
20.11.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
20.11.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
20.11.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
20.11.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
20.11.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
20.11.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
20.11.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
20.11.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
20.11.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
20.11.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
20.11.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR18.05.2005
[2008/52]
Former [2008/45]FR30.06.2005
Documents cited:Search[X]DE4434262  (BERNHARDT WILLI L DIPL ING [DE], et al) [X] 1,4,5,10,11,13 * the whole document *;
 [X]US4606735  (WILDER JOSEPH R [US], et al) [X] 1,3,11,13 * the whole document *;
 [XA]US3702612  (SCHLESINGER ROBERT M) [X] 1,11,13 * the whole document * [A] 2;
 [X]US5137519  (LITTRELL PERRY K [US], et al) [X] 1,11,13 * the whole document *;
 [XA]US5188609  (BAYLESS BRIAN [US], et al) [X] 1,13 * the whole document * [A] 2;
 [X]US4769010  (FENTON JR PAUL V [US], et al) [X] 1,13 * the whole document *;
 [X]US3794032  (DEROUINEAU R) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3782388  (PAGE S) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5352211  (MERSKELLY WILLIAM L [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0807450  (REDMOND ANTHONY DAMIEN [GB]) [A] 1 * abstract *