Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0981161

EP0981161 - Process of fabricating a semiconductor structure including a conductive fuse [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/08]Semiconductor structure including a conductive fuse and process for fabrication thereof
[2008/08]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.06.2009
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.01.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 10.02.2010  [2010/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Former [2000/08]For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
Old Orchard Road
Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US
For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Arndt, Kenneth C., c/o IBM United Kingdom Ltd.
Intellectual Property Law, Hursley Park
Winchester, Hampshire S021 2JN / GB
02 / Gambino, Jeffrey P., c/o IBM United Kingdom Ltd.
Intellectual Property Law, Hursley Park
Winchester, Hampshire S021 2JN / GB
03 / Mandelma, Jack A., c/o IBM United Kingdom Ltd.
Intellectual Property Law, Hursley Park
Winchester, Hampshire S021 2JN / GB
04 / Narayan, Chandrasekhar, c/o IBM United Kingdom Ltd
Intellectual Property Law, Hursley Park
Winchester, Hampshire S021 2JN / GB
05 / Schnabel, Raines F., c/o IBM United Kingdom Ltd.
Intellectual Property Law, Hursley Park
Winchester, Hampshire S021 2JN / GB
06 / Schutz, Ronald J., c/o IBM United Kingdom Ltd.
Intellectual Property Law, Hursley Park
Winchester, Hampshire S021 2JN / GB
07 / Tobben, Dirk, c/o IBM United Kingdom Ltd.
Intellectual Property Law, Hursley Park
Winchester, Hampshire S021 2JN / GB
[2000/08]
Representative(s)Davies, Simon Robert
I B M
UK Intellectual Property Department
Hursley Park
Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/43]Davies, Simon Robert
I B M UK Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park
Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
Former [2000/08]Davies, Simon Robert
IBM, United Kingdom Limited, Intellectual Property Law, Hursley Park
Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
Application number, filing date99304728.117.06.1999
[2000/08]
Priority number, dateUS1998010564726.06.1998         Original published format: US 105647
[2000/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0981161
Date:23.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0981161
Date:12.06.2002
[2002/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0981161
Date:13.08.2008
Language:EN
[2008/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.04.2002
ClassificationInternational:H01L23/525
[2000/08]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   NL [2003/10]
Former [2000/08]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Halbleiterstruktur mit einer leitenden Sicherung[2008/08]
English:Process of fabricating a semiconductor structure including a conductive fuse[2008/08]
French:Procédé de la fabrication d'une structure semi-conductrice comportant un fusible conducteur[2008/08]
Former [2000/08]Halbleiterstruktur mit einer leitenden Sicherung und dessen Herstellungsverfahren
Former [2000/08]Semiconductor structure including a conductive fuse and process for fabrication thereof
Former [2000/08]Structure semi-conductrice comportant un fusible conducteur et procédé de sa fabrication
Examination procedure08.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/36]
29.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.02.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.06.2008Fee for grant paid
02.06.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.05.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
13.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
16.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
15.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
15.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
20.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
18.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
30.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT13.08.2008
NL13.08.2008
[2010/06]
Former [2009/12]NL13.08.2008
Documents cited:Search[XA]JPS6289338  ;
 [XA]JPS6480038  ;
 [A]US4628590  (UDO SHINJI ET AL) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 61 - column 4, line 38; figures 1A-H *;
 [A]JPS59200453  ;
 [A]US5451810  (TIGELAAR HOWARD L ET AL) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 12 - column 4, line 33; figures 1-4 *
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870917), vol. 011, no. 288, Database accession no. (E - 542), & JP62089338 A 19870423 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1-5 * abstract * [A] 6-10
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890711), vol. 013, no. 301, Database accession no. (E - 785), & JP01080038 A 19890324 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1-5 * abstract * [A] 6-10
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850319), vol. 009, no. 061, Database accession no. (E - 303), & JP59200453 A 19841113 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO KK) [A] 1-10 * abstract *