blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0981161 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0981161



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 116
17.06.2009 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
15.09.2008 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
17.07.2008 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
02.06.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.06.2008 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
02.06.2008 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
02.06.2008 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
02.06.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
12.02.2008 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
12.02.2008 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
12.02.2008 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
12.02.2008 Text intended for grant Search / examination 13
05.02.2008 Reply to a complaint letter Search / examination 2
07.01.2008 Complaint letter by applicant Search / examination 2
07.11.2007 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.11.2007 General enquiry Search / examination 1
07.11.2007 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.01.2007 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
22.01.2007 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.06.2004 Claims Search / examination 2
19.06.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
17.06.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
11.02.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
11.02.2004 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 1
11.02.2004 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
24.02.2003 Claims Search / examination 2
24.02.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
29.10.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
29.10.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.07.2002 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
17.06.2002 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
29.04.2002 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
29.04.2002 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
29.04.2002 European search report Search / examination 1
12.01.2000 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
17.06.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
17.06.1999 Claims Search / examination 2
17.06.1999 Description Search / examination 7
17.06.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
17.06.1999 Drawings Search / examination 4
17.06.1999 Priority document Search / examination 24
17.06.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7