Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0981161


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
08.01.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.02.2010  [2010/06]
19.06.2009 No opposition filed within time limit published on  22.07.2009  [2009/30]
13.02.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.03.2009  [2009/12]
19.09.2008 Change - representative published on  22.10.2008  [2008/43]
11.07.2008 (Expected) grant published on  13.08.2008  [2008/33]
08.07.2008 Change: Renewal fee paid
08.07.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.06.2008 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
12.06.2008 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
02.02.2008 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
18.01.2008 Change - German title published on  20.02.2008  [2008/08]
27.06.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.06.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.06.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.06.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.06.2004 New entry: Reply to examination report
07.02.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
28.06.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.05.2003 Change - extension states
28.02.2003 Examination report or reply
17.01.2003 Definitive list of designations published on  05.03.2003  [2003/10]
25.10.2002 Examination report or reply
25.10.2002 First examination report
19.07.2002 Request for examination filed published on  04.09.2002  [2002/36]
25.06.2002 Renewal fee
26.04.2002 Publication of search report published on  12.06.2002  [2002/24]
25.06.2001 Renewal fee
07.01.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  23.02.2000 [2000/08]