blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0981161
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2000058655Global Dossier 25.02.2000A
Priority number Date
US10564798 26.06.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0981161Global Dossier 13.08.2008B1
EP0981161 12.06.2002A3
EP0981161 23.02.2000A2
Priority number Date
US10564798 26.06.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69939300D 25.09.2008D1
Priority number Date
US10564798 26.06.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR100350545B 28.08.2002B1
KR20000006375 25.01.2000A
Priority number Date
US10564798 26.06.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TW415077B 11.12.2000B
Priority number Date
US10564798 26.06.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6037648 14.03.2000A
Priority number Date
US10564798 26.06.1998