Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969026

EP0969026 - Method of manufacturing isobutylene copolymer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.02.2001
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip02.02.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.03.2001 [2001/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Omura, Tetsuya
5-5-402, Ogawahigashi-cho 3-chome
Kodaira City, Tokyo / JP
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Whalley, Kevin
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Whalley, Kevin
MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date99304863.622.06.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateJP1998018277329.06.1998         Original published format: JP 18277398
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0969026
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:C08F210/10
[2000/01]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2000/37]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Isobutylen Copolymerisat[2000/01]
English:Method of manufacturing isobutylene copolymer[2000/01]
French:Procédé pour préparer un copolymère d'isobutylène[2000/01]
Examination procedure06.07.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/12]
23.10.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/12]
Documents cited:Search[X]DE2532567  (RAFFINAGE CIE FRANCAISE) [X] 1-11 * page 2, line 1 - page 6, line 15; examples I-X *;
 [X]US3757000  (SCARDIGLIA F ET AL) [X] 1-4,8,11 * column 5, line 19 - column 5, line 46; example 1; claims 1-3 *