Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969679

EP0969679 - Adjustable height ground level serviceable cellsite [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.08.2004
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip27.08.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.10.2004  [2004/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Bobadilla, Omar Javier
78 Gloucester Road
Parsippany, New Jersey 07054 / US
02 / Canzonier, James Vincent
935 Bay Avenue
Point Pleasant Beach, New Jersey 08742 / US
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk , et al
Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green
Essex IG8 0TU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk , et al
Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB
Application number, filing date99304916.223.06.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateUS1998010924130.06.1998         Original published format: US 109241
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0969679
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0969679
Date:12.07.2000
[2000/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0969679
Date:22.10.2003
Language:EN
[2003/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01Q1/24
[2000/29]
Former International [2000/01]H04Q7/30
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   SE [2001/12]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Auf Grundniveau wartbare Zellstation mit anpassbare Höhe[2000/01]
English:Adjustable height ground level serviceable cellsite[2000/01]
French:Site cellullaire à hauteur ajustable et à entretien au niveau du sol[2000/01]
Examination procedure14.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/08]
19.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.05.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.08.2003Fee for grant paid
11.08.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.07.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
13.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
16.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]US5570546  (BUTTERWORTH ROBERT S ET AL) [A] 1 * column 3, line 43 - line 50 * * column 4, line 59 - column 5, line 35 *;
 [A]US4850558  (LESCHOT GEORGES-ANDRE) [A] 1 * column 1, line 6 - line 20 * * column 2, line 37 - column 3, line 20 *;
 [A]US4607389  (HALGRIMSON EDWIN A) [A] 1 * column 2, line 20 - line 27 * * column 3, line 59 - column 4, line 6 *