Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969416

EP0969416 - Display techniques for object visibility in a three-dimensional virtual world [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  22.11.2002
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2002Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 08.01.2003  [2003/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Edmark, John T.
2350 Broadway, Apartment 925
New York, NY 10024 / US
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway , et al
Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green
Essex, IG8 0TU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr. , et al
Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB
Application number, filing date99304918.823.06.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateUS1998010802930.06.1998         Original published format: US 108029
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0969416
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0969416
Date:24.04.2002
[2002/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:G06T15/40
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/01]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Anzeigetechnik für Objektsichtbarkeit in einer drei-dimensionalen Welt[2000/01]
English:Display techniques for object visibility in a three-dimensional virtual world[2000/01]
French:Techniques d'affichage pour visibilité d'object dans un monde à trois dimensions[2000/01]
Examination procedure10.10.2002Examination requested  [2002/50]
20.11.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
13.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0582815  (IBM) [X] 1-5,7,8 * page 2, line 38 - line 40 * * page 2, line 47 - line 55 * * page 5, line 7 - line 9 * * page 8, line 20 - line 25 *