Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969620

EP0969620 - WDM optical communications networks and method for provisioning [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.04.2002
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip26.04.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.06.2002  [2002/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Alanyali, Murat
Bilkent Lojmanlari 80/2
Bilkent, Ankara 06533 / TR
02 / Ayanoglu, Ender
19 Morford Place, Apt. 3i
Red Bank, New Jersey 07701 / US
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Johnston, Kenneth Graham , et al
Lucent Technologies EUR-IP UK Ltd Unit 18, Core 3 Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue
Enfield, EN3 7XB / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Johnston, Kenneth Graham , et al
Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB
Application number, filing date99304921.223.06.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateUS1998010925030.06.1998         Original published format: US 109250
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0969620
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0969620
Date:07.02.2001
[2001/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.12.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04J14/02, H04Q11/00
[2000/01]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2001/43]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Wellenlängenmultiplexierten Kommunikationsnetze und Verfahren zur Bereitstellung davon[2000/01]
English:WDM optical communications networks and method for provisioning[2000/01]
French:Réseaux à multiplexage d'onde et procédé pour approvissioner[2000/01]
Examination procedure08.08.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/24]
13.12.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2002/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
25.09.2001DE   M01   Not yet paid
25.09.2001FR   M01   Not yet paid
25.09.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
25.09.2001M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]  - ALANYALI M ET AL, "PROVISIONING ALGORITHMS FOR WDM OPTICAL NETWORKS", PROCEEDINGS IEEE INFOCOM. THE CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS,US,NEW YORK, NY: IEEE, (19980329), ISBN 0-7803-4384-0, pages 910 - 918, XP000852077 [X] 1-3,9-13 * page 910, column L, paragraph 2 - page 913, column L, paragraph 3; figure 1 * * page 913, column L, paragraph 5 - page 915, column L, paragraph 1; figure 4 * * page 916, column L, paragraph 2 * * page 916, column L, paragraph 4 * [Y] 4-8

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/INFCOM.1998.665116
 [Y]  - KARASAN E ET AL, "EFFECTS OF WAVELENGTH ROUTING AND SELECTION ALGORITHMS ON WAVELENGTH CONVERSION GAIN IN WDM OPTICAL NETWORKS", IEEE / ACM TRANSACTIONS ON NETWORKING,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, (19980401), vol. 6, no. 2, ISSN 1063-6692, pages 186 - 196, XP000751631 [Y] 4-8 * page 187, column L, paragraph 3 - page 192, column R, paragraph 3 * * page 193, column L, paragraph 2 - page 195, column L, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/90.664267
 [A]  - WAUTERS N ET AL, "Design of the optical path layer in multiwavelength cross-connected networks", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS, JUNE 1996, IEEE, USA, (199606), vol. 14, no. 5, ISSN 0733-8716, pages 881 - 892, XP002155646 [A] 1-13 * page 883, column L, paragraph 5 - page 887, column R, paragraph 2; figure 2 * * page 890, column L, paragraph 2 - page 891, column R, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/49.510911