Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0976376

EP0976376 - Ramp step assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.10.2002
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.12.2002  [2002/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UVG (Ambulances) Limited
Locksley Road, Armytage Road Industrial Estate Brighouse
West Yorkshire HD6 1QF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/51]For all designated states
UVG (Ambulances) Limited
Locksley Road, Armytage Road Industrial Estate
Brighouse, West Yorkshire HD6 1QF / GB
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
UVG (Ambulances) Limited
Lockskey Road, Armytage Road Industrial Estate
Brighous, West Yorkshire HD6 1QF / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Kitchen, Maurice
10, Ashbourne Way
Cleckheaton, West Yorkshire BD19 5JA / GB
02 / Hugill, Mark
23 Northway Gardens
Mirfield, West Yorkshire WF14 0LD / GB
03 / Heaton, Nigel
9 Saxton Street
Liversedge, West Yorkshire WF15 6AD / GB
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Neill, Alastair William , et al
Appleyard Lees
15 Clare Road
Halifax
West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Neill, Alastair William , et al
Appleyard Lees & Co. 15 Clare Road
Halifax West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB
Application number, filing date99304943.623.06.1999
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateGB1998001637429.07.1998         Original published format: GB 9816374
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0976376
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0976376
Date:21.06.2000
[2000/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0976376
Date:19.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP08.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61G3/06
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IE [2001/15]
Former [2001/09](deleted) 
Former [2000/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Rampe oder Treppevorrichtung[2000/05]
English:Ramp step assembly[2000/05]
French:Dispositif d'escalier ou rampe[2000/05]
Examination procedure27.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/30]
30.05.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
26.07.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.07.2000Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
25.01.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.04.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.05.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.07.2001Fee for grant paid
12.07.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
18.01.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
18.01.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
18.01.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
18.01.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
18.01.2000DE   M01   Fee paid on   15.02.2001
18.01.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
18.01.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
18.01.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
18.01.2000FR   M01   Fee paid on   15.02.2001
18.01.2000GB   M01   Fee paid on   15.02.2001
18.01.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
18.01.2000IE   M01   Fee paid on   15.02.2001
18.01.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
18.01.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
18.01.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
18.01.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
18.01.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
18.01.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200103   M06   Fee paid on   13.10.2001
Documents cited:Search[X]GB2306436  (TAURUS BODIES [GB]) [X] 1,2,4,9,10 * page 6, line 25 - page 7, line 1; figures 11-13 *;
 [A]GB2268133  (LONDON TAXIS INTERNATIONAL LIM [GB]) [A] 2-5,7-9 * page 2, line 26 - line 28 * * page 3, line 9 - line 18; figure - *;
 [PX]EP0901783  (LTI LIMITED [GB]) [PX] 1-4,9 * column 3, line 4 - line 12 * * column 5, line 13 - line 17; figure - *