Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974281

EP0974281 - Footwear construction [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.01.2005
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip21.01.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.03.2005  [2005/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wolverine World Wide, Inc.
295 Phillip Street 9341 Courtland Drive N.E. Rockford
Michigan 49351 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Wolverine World Wide, Inc.
9341 Courtland Drive, N.E.
Rockford, Michigan 49351 / US
Inventor(s)01 / McClelland, Larry W.
8175 Oakview Ridge
Rockford, Michigan 49341 / US
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan , et al
KILBURN & STRODE, 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date99304973.324.06.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateUS1998010482525.06.1998         Original published format: US 104825
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0974281
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0974281
Date:05.07.2000
[2000/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:A43B9/06, A43B15/00
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesGB [2001/11]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Schuhaufbau[2000/04]
English:Footwear construction[2000/04]
French:Assemblage d'un article chaussant[2000/04]
Examination procedure27.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/04]
06.01.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
25.05.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
12.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.09.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/10]
07.10.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
07.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
04.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
04.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
22.02.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
22.02.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
22.02.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
22.02.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
22.02.2001DE   M01   Not yet paid
22.02.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
22.02.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
22.02.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
22.02.2001FR   M01   Not yet paid
22.02.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
22.02.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
22.02.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
22.02.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
22.02.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
22.02.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
22.02.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
22.02.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US2079705  (H. GORDON) [A] 1,2,4,13 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE1012846  (K. MAERTENS) [A] 1,2,4,13 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE473381  (E. ARNOLD) [A] 1,2,4 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB815876  (J. CORCORAN SHOE) [A] 1,2,4 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR495987  (OCH FRERES) [A] 1,2,4 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2086710  (CLARKS) [A] 1,2,4 * the whole document *