Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0975142

EP0975142 - Hand held scanning device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.10.2002
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.12.2002  [2002/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company, A Delaware Corporation
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, California 94304 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Dow, James C.
5300 Clarendon Hills Drive
Fort Collins, CO 80526 / US
02 / Berg, Thomas E.
4801 Chippendale Drive
Fort Collins, CO 80526 / US
03 / Sims, David J.
3218 Wetterhorn Drive
Fort Collins, CO 80525 / US
04 / Henderson, Scott
424 Henry Street, Apt. 3
Brooklyn, NY 11231 / US
05 / Stowell, Davin
147 East 19th Street, Apt. 4E
New York, NY 10003 / US
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Powell, Stephen David , et al
Williams Powell Staple Court 11 Staple Inn Buildings
London, WC1V 7QH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Powell, Stephen David , et al
WILLIAMS, POWELL & ASSOCIATES 4 St Paul's Churchyard
London EC4M 8AY / GB
Application number, filing date99305061.628.06.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateUS1998012063722.07.1998         Original published format: US 120637
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0975142
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0975142
Date:03.01.2001
[2001/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04N1/107
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/38]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Handgeführte Abtastvorrichtung[2000/04]
English:Hand held scanning device[2000/04]
French:Dispositif de lecture guidé à la main[2000/04]
Examination procedure12.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/15]
18.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.05.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/49]
03.07.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4716291  (SAKAMOTO HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 7,9 * abstract * [Y] 1,4;
 [X]US5414533  (SAWASE KENSUKE [JP], et al) [X] 7 * abstract *;
 [YA]EP0183980  (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,4 * page 8, line 27 - line 31 * [A] 7;
 [A]DE3729751  (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP])