blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0970659


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
14.09.2007 No opposition filed within time limit published on  17.10.2007  [2007/42]
08.09.2006 (Expected) grant published on  11.10.2006  [2006/41]
31.08.2006 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
31.08.2006 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
23.06.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.04.2006 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
25.06.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.06.2005 New entry: Reply to examination report
06.04.2005 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
01.02.2005 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
22.09.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
22.09.2004 Deletion: Reply to examination report
25.06.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.04.2004 New entry: Reply to examination report
28.01.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
19.09.2003 First examination report
18.09.2003 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
26.06.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.06.2002 Renewal fee
21.06.2001 Renewal fee
02.10.2000 Change - extension states
04.08.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  20.09.2000 [2000/38]
30.06.2000 Request for examination filed published on  16.08.2000 [2000/33]
26.11.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.01.2000 [2000/02]