blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0970659
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9878184Global Dossier 30.01.2018B2
US2014107537 17.04.2014A1
Priority number Date
US10641598 29.06.1998
US201113223357 01.09.2011
US201314108945 17.12.2013
US85694407 18.09.2007
US82160610 23.06.2010
US90955701 20.07.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8617194Global Dossier 31.12.2013B2
US2011319918 29.12.2011A1
Priority number Date
US10641598 29.06.1998
US201113223357 01.09.2011
US85694407 18.09.2007
US82160610 23.06.2010
US90955701 20.07.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8021381Global Dossier 20.09.2011B2
US2010262173 14.10.2010A1
Priority number Date
US10641598 29.06.1998
US85694407 18.09.2007
US82160610 23.06.2010
US90955701 20.07.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7758600Global Dossier 20.07.2010B2
US2008051814 28.02.2008A1
Priority number Date
US10641598 29.06.1998
US85694407 18.09.2007
US90955701 20.07.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2003241752B 09.03.2006B2
AU2003241752 25.09.2003A1
Priority number Date
US10641598 29.06.1998
AU3684499 28.06.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7300446 27.11.2007B2
US2002004665 10.01.2002A1
Priority number Date
US10641598 29.06.1998
US90955701 20.07.2001
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2000041991Global Dossier 15.02.2000A
Priority number Date
US10641598 29.06.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0970659Global Dossier 11.10.2006B1
EP0970659 12.01.2000A1
Priority number Date
US10641598 29.06.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AU764781B 28.08.2003B2
AU3684499 13.01.2000A
Priority number Date
US10641598 29.06.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CA2276309 26.02.2008C
CA2276309 29.12.1999A1
Priority number Date
US10641598 29.06.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69933514T 14.06.2007T2
DE69933514D 23.11.2006D1
Priority number Date
US10641598 29.06.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2274604T 16.05.2007T3
Priority number Date
US10641598 29.06.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6309400 30.10.2001B2
US2001027325 04.10.2001A1
Priority number Date
US10641598 29.06.1998