Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970659

EP0970659 - Curved ultrasonic blade having a trapezoidal cross section [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.09.2007
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.10.2007  [2007/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ETHICON ENDO-SURGERY, INC.
4545 Creek Road
Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / US
[2000/02]
Inventor(s)01 / Beaupre, Jean M.
9200B Hunters Creek
Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / US
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Mercer, Christopher Paul
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London
WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Mercer, Christopher Paul
Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date99305064.028.06.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateUS1998010641529.06.1998         Original published format: US 106415
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970659
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970659
Date:11.10.2006
Language:EN
[2006/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/32
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/38]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Gekrümmte Ultraschallklinge mit trapezförmigem Querschnitt[2000/02]
English:Curved ultrasonic blade having a trapezoidal cross section[2000/02]
French:Lame ultrasonique incurvée à coupe transversale trapèzoidale[2000/02]
Examination procedure16.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/33]
22.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
27.05.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.04.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.08.2006Fee for grant paid
22.08.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.07.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
14.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
14.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0830845  (UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORP [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 18 - line 25; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5669922  (HOOD LARRY [US]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 55; figures 2,3 *;
 [A]WO8602257  (COOPERVISION INC [US]) [A] 1 * page 5, line 6 - page 6, line 10; figures 2-4 *;
 [A]EP0456470  (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO [JP]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 3 - line 8; figure 5 *;
 [A]US3086288  (LEWIS BALAMUTH, et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 73 - line 75; figure 4 *;
 [A]WO9314709  (ULTRACISION INC [US]) [A] 1 * page 10, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2; figures 1-3 *
ExaminationUS5322055