Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969229

EP0969229 - Continuously variable transmission system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.10.2003
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.10.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.12.2003  [2003/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Isuzu Motors Limited
26-1, Minami-ohi 6-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
ISUZU MOTORS LIMITED
26-1, Minami-ohi 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Inoue, Eiji, c/o Isuzu Motors Limited
Fujisawa Factory, 8 Tuchidana
Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa / JP
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Jenkins, Peter David , et al
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Jenkins, Peter David , et al
PAGE WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street
London WC1N 2LS / GB
Application number, filing date99305090.529.06.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateJP1998018526530.06.1998         Original published format: JP 18526598
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0969229
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0969229
Date:11.09.2002
[2002/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:F16H61/00
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/22]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Stufenloses Getriebe[2000/01]
English:Continuously variable transmission system[2000/01]
French:Transmission à variation continue[2000/01]
Examination procedure12.03.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/50]
09.07.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2003/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
19.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
17.04.2003M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200305   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5206805  (PETZOLD WERNER P [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 22 * * column 4, line 3 - column 8, line 46 * * claim 1 * [Y] 3;
 [XY]US5024310  (MURANO KATSUAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 6 - line 18 * * column 2, line 26 - line 58 * * column 3, line 64 - column 5, line 22 * * figure 1 * [Y] 3;
 [X]EP0813005  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * page 3, line 38 - line 42 * * page 5, line 25 - line 51 * * figure 1 *;
 [X]DE4324810  (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 19 - column 4, line 9; figure 1 *;
 [Y]DE19713460  (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [Y] 3 * column 4, line 54 - column 7, line 39; figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]DE4406694  (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [Y] 3 * column 4, line 8 - column 6, line 2; figures 1,2 *
by applicantJPH0830523
 JPH09166195