Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968972

EP0968972 - Process for fabricating optical fiber [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.07.2002
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.09.2002  [2002/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Mandich, Mary Louise
1037 Vosselier Ave
Martinsville, New Jersey 08836 / US
02 / Reents, William David Jr.
18 Glen Gary Road
Middlesex, New Jersey 08846 / US
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk , et al
Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green
Essex IG8 0TU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/11]Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk , et al
Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB
Former [2000/01]Johnston, Kenneth Graham , et al
Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB
Application number, filing date99305104.429.06.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateUS1998010982702.07.1998         Original published format: US 109827
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968972
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968972
Date:19.09.2001
Language:EN
[2001/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:C03B37/016, C03B19/12, C03B19/14, C03B37/014
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2000/37]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Herstellen einer optischen Faser[2000/01]
English:Process for fabricating optical fiber[2000/01]
French:procédé de fabrication d une fibre optique[2000/01]
Examination procedure29.06.1999Request for accelerated examination filed
09.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
26.08.1999Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
01.02.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.06.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.09.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
28.11.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.02.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.03.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.05.2001Fee for grant paid
31.05.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.06.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH0477327  ;
 [X]JPH01164740  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) [X] 1,5-7;
 [X]EP0140651  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,7,9,11 * figure 8; examples 4,6-1,; claims 1,4,7-10 *;
 [X]GB2165233  (SUWA SEIKOSHA KK) [X] 1,3,4,7,11 * claims 1,29-37 *;
 [DA]EP0614856  (AT & T CORP [US]) [DA] 1 * claims 1-15 *;
 [A]JPS6469532  ;
 [A]JPS56100145
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920626), vol. 16, no. 289, [X] 1,4-7,9-11 * abstract * * page 145, lower right-hand column *
 [X]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19900219), vol. 112, no. 8, Database accession no. 61546, XP002115418 [X] 1,5-7 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890622), vol. 13, no. 273, [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19811114), vol. 5, no. 178, [A] 1 * abstract *