Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968930

EP0968930 - Wrapper for packaging lens-fitted photo film unit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.02.2001
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.02.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.04.2001 [2001/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD.
210 Nakanuma
Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0123 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD.
210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi
Kanagawa 250-01 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Takaguchi, Miho, c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd.
2-26-30 Nishiazabu, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
02 / Ikegami, Akihiko, c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd.
2-26-30 Nishiazabu, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Leale, Robin George
Frank B. Dehn & Co.,European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
[2000/01]
Application number, filing date99305125.929.06.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateJP1998018452530.06.1998         Original published format: JP 18452598
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968930
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:B65D73/00, B65D81/20
[2000/01]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2000/37]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verpackungshülle für Kamera[2000/01]
English:Wrapper for packaging lens-fitted photo film unit[2000/01]
French:Enveloppe d'emballage pour appareil photographique[2000/01]
Examination procedure06.07.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/14]
03.11.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/14]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
17.08.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
17.08.2000M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2937746  (FERGUSON JOHN B) [X] 1-8,11,12,14,15 * column 3, line 36 - line 39; figure - * [Y] 16;
 [X]DE29719599U  (PFANKUCH MASCHINEN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,12 * figure - *;
 [Y]US5738211  (ICHINO SHUICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 16 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE7631771U  (UNILEVER NV [NL]) [X] 1-10 * page 1, line 12 - line 15; figure - *;
 [X]DE8407866U  (KNAPP GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5,12,13 * figure - *;
 [X]DE8425411U  (LANDERER GMBH & CO KG A [DE]) [X] 1-5,7 * figure - *