Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974954

EP0974954 - Game system and computer-readable storage medium storing a program for executing a game [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2007
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.05.2007  [2007/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Konami Corporation
4-1, Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-6330 / JP
[2006/12]
Former [2003/04]For all designated states
Konami Corporation
4-1, Marunouchi
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6330 / JP
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Konami Co., Ltd.
302 Minatojimanakamachi 7-chome, Chuo-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Wada, Toshifumi
302 Hakuyou Haitsu, 5-6-10 Nishi-Shinjuku
Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Brunner, Michael John
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Brunner, Michael John
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date99305139.029.06.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateJP1998018657801.07.1998         Original published format: JP 18657898
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974954
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974954
Date:22.03.2006
Language:EN
[2006/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:G10H1/00, G10H1/36, G09B15/00
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/40]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Spielsystem und Rechnerlesbares Aufzeichnungsmedium ein Programm zur Ausführung eines Spieles aufzeichnend[2000/04]
English:Game system and computer-readable storage medium storing a program for executing a game[2000/04]
French:Système ludique et support d'enregistrement de programme pour l'exécution d'un jeu[2000/04]
Examination procedure13.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/32]
23.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.02.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.09.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.01.2006Fee for grant paid
05.01.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.12.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
14.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[PX]EP0903169  (KONAMI CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1,4,5,7,11-16 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0094] * * paragraph [0103]; figures 6,7; claim 1 *;
 [A]US5270475  (WEISS NATHANIEL [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * column 18, line 40 - column 19, line 35 * * column 20, line 43 - line 66; figures 12,13,17,18 *;
 [A]US5092216  (WADHAMS WAYNE [US]) [A] 1,6 * column 3, line 21 - line 68 *;
 [A]US4694723  (SHINOHARA ISAO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 13 - column 3, line 38; figures 1-3 *