Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969675

EP0969675 - Image signal processing method, image signal processing system, storage medium, and image sensing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  19.11.1999
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2001Change - extension states 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TADAHIRO OHMI
1-17-301 Komegafukuro 2-chome, Aoba-ku Sendai-shi
Miyagi-ken / JP
For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
TADAHIRO OHMI
1-17-301 Komegafukuro 2-chome, Aoba-ku
Sendai-shi, Miyagi-ken / JP
For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ohmi, Tadahiro
1-17-301, Komegafukuro 2-chome, Aoba-ku
Sendai-shi, Miyagi-ken / JP
02 / Sugawa, Shigetoshi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
03 / Ueno, Isamu, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
04 / Nakayama, Takahiro
2-3-112, Kunimi 5-chome, Aoba-ku, Sendai-shi
Miyagi-ken / JP
05 / Ogawa, Katsuhisa, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
06 / Morimoto, Tatsuro
3-2, Kamisugi 6-chome, Aoba-ku, Sendai-shi
Miyagi-ken / JP
07 / Sakurai, Katsuhito, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
08 / Koizumi, Toru, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
09 / Kochi, Tetsunobu, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
Beresford Crump LLP
16 High Holborn
London WC1V 6BX / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
BERESFORD & Co. High Holborn 2-5 Warwick Court
London WC1R 5DJ / GB
Application number, filing date99305141.630.06.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateJP1998020443803.07.1998         Original published format: JP 20443898
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0969675
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0969675
Date:02.11.2000
[2000/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04N9/64, H04N9/04
[2000/44]
Former International [2000/01]H04N9/64
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2001/29]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zu Verarbeitung von Bildsignalen, System zu Verabeitung von Bildsignalen, Speichermedium und Bildaufnahmevorrichtung[2000/01]
English:Image signal processing method, image signal processing system, storage medium, and image sensing apparatus[2000/01]
French:Procédé de traitement du signal image, système de traitement du signal image, support d'enrégistrement et appareil de prise de vues[2000/01]
Examination procedure28.09.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
26.06.2001M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200103   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XP]US5818525  (ELABD HAMMAM [US]) [XP] 1-17 * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 11 * * column 6, line 47 - line 67 * * figures 1-4 * * column 4, line 1 - line 64; figure 7 *;
 [X]US5172227  (TSAI YUSHING T [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * column 3, line 42 - column 4, line 23 *