Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974899

EP0974899 - Information processing apparatus, information processing method, and recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.04.2010
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip09.04.2010No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.05.2010  [2010/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
6-7-35 Kitashinagawa
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2009/23]For all designated states
Sony Corporation
6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
SONY CORPORATION
6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sueyoshi, Takahiko, c/o Intellectual Property Dept
Sony Corp., 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
02 / Shiono, Tomoki, c/o Intellectual Property Dept.
Sony Corp., 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Turner, James Arthur , et al
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Turner, James Arthur , et al
D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date99305163.030.06.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateJP1998018434930.06.1998         Original published format: JP 18434998
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0974899
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0974899
Date:26.07.2006
[2006/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974899
Date:03.06.2009
Language:EN
[2009/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.06.2006
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/46
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2007/18]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Informationsverarbeitungsgerät, Informationsverarbeitungsverfahren, und Aufzeichnungsmedium[2000/04]
English:Information processing apparatus, information processing method, and recording medium[2000/04]
French:Appareil pour traitement d'information, méthode de traitement d'information, et support d'enrégistrement[2000/04]
Examination procedure10.01.2007Examination requested  [2007/18]
09.05.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.08.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.04.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.08.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.11.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.03.2009Fee for grant paid
12.03.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.03.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
14.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
27.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
14.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[X]US5535416  (FEENEY JAMES W [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * column 1 - column 4 *;
 [X]US5029077  (FATAHALIAN FARHAD H [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 25 * * column 4, line 53 - column 5, line 7 *;
 [A]US5390300  (PRIBNOW RICHARD D [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5765057  (ISHIGURO MINORU [JP]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5708881  (TSUKAHARA DAIKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *
by applicantUS5029077