Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969511

EP0969511 - Power module board and power module using the board [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  19.08.2005
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.08.2005Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 05.10.2005  [2005/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd.
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 541 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LTD.
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hirose, Yoshiyuki, c/o Itami Works of Sumitomo
Electric Industries, Ltd., 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome
Hyogo / JP
02 / Sasaki, Kazutaka, c/o Itami Works of Sumitomo
Electric Industries, Ltd., 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome
Hyogo / JP
03 / Shimazu, Mitsuru, c/o Itami Works of Sumitomo
Electric Industries, Ltd., 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome
Hyogo / JP
04 / Nakata, Hirohiko, c/o Itami Works of Sumitomo
Electric Industries, Ltd., 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome
Hyogo / JP
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Cross, Rupert Edward Blount , et al
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Cross, Rupert Edward Blount , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street
London EC4A 1PQ / GB
Application number, filing date99305167.130.06.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateJP1998018421730.06.1998         Original published format: JP 18421798
JP1999002148029.01.1999         Original published format: JP 2148099
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0969511
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0969511
Date:29.10.2003
[2003/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.09.2003
ClassificationInternational:H01L25/16, H01L25/07, H01L23/40
[2003/44]
Former International [2000/01]H01L25/16
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2004/30]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Leistungsmodulplatte und Modul mit dieser[2000/01]
English:Power module board and power module using the board[2000/01]
French:plaquette pour module de puissance et module comprenant le meme[2000/01]
Examination procedure21.10.2003Examination requested  [2003/51]
10.08.2005Application withdrawn by applicant  [2005/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
08.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
18.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
17.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5739586  (CANNIZZARO SHARON M [US], et al) [X] 1,4-6,9 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3;
 [XY]US5258887  (FORTUNE G CLARK [US]) [X] 1,4-6,8 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3;
 [Y]US4611745  (NAKAHASHI MASAKO [JP], et al) [Y] 2,3 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9306705  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *