Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969390

EP0969390 - IMAGE PROCESSING APPARATUS, IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/01]Image processing apparatus, image processing method and storage medium
[2016/43]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.01.2018
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.02.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  31.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.01.2018No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.02.2018  [2018/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2017/12]
Former [2010/35]For all designated states
Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
SONY CORPORATION
6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ihara, Keigo, @c/o Int. Prop. Dpt. Sony Corp.
6-7-35 Kitashinagawa
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
02 / Rekimoto, Junichi, @c/o Int. Prop. Dpt., Sony Corp.
6-7-35 Kitashinagawa
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
03 / Sueyoshi, Takahiko, @c/o Int. Prop. Dpt. Sony Corp.
6-7-35 Kitashinagawa
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
04 / Konishi, Toru, @c/o Int. Prop. Dpt. Sony Corp.
6-7-35 Kitashinagawa
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
 [2017/12]
Former [2000/01]01 / Ihara, Keigo, c/o Int. Prop. Dpt. Sony Corp.
6-7-35 Kitashinagawa, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
02 / Rekimoto, Junichi, c/o Int. Prop. Dpt., Sony Corp.
6-7-35 Kitashinagawa, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
03 / Sueyoshi, Takahiko, c/o Int. Prop. Dpt. Sony Corp.
6-7-35 Kitashinagawa, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
04 / Konishi, Toru, c/o Int. Prop. Dpt. Sony Corp.
6-7-35 Kitashinagawa, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[2017/12]
Former [2014/20]Jackson, Jonathan Andrew , et al
D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Former [2000/01]Turner, James Arthur , et al
D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date99305174.730.06.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateJP1998018435130.06.1998         Original published format: JP 18435198
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0969390
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0969390
Date:08.02.2006
[2006/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0969390
Date:22.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.12.2005
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2017/12]
Former [2006/41]DE,  FR,  GB 
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:BILDVERARBEITUNGSGERÄT, BILDVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND SPEICHERMEDIUM[2016/43]
English:IMAGE PROCESSING APPARATUS, IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD AND STORAGE MEDIUM[2016/43]
French:DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGES, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGES ET MEDIUM DE STOCKAGE[2016/43]
Former [2000/01]Bildverarbeitungsgerät, Bildverarbeitungsverfahren und Speichermedium
Former [2000/01]Image processing apparatus, image processing method and storage medium
Former [2000/01]Dispositif de traitement d'images, procédé de traitement d'images et medium de stockage
Examination procedure14.07.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.07.2006Examination requested  [2006/35]
05.03.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.07.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.03.2010Date of oral proceedings
11.03.2010Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
11.03.2010Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
13.04.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.08.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.01.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
06.02.2017Fee for grant paid
06.02.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination15.04.2010Appeal received No.  T1554/10
09.07.2010Statement of grounds filed
17.12.2015Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
17.12.2015Date of oral proceedings
23.12.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)EP10172968.9  / EP2249264
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.03.2008
Opposition(s)02.01.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
14.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
27.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
14.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
16.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
29.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
22.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 13
27.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 14
20.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 15
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 16
19.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 17
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 18
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0697793  (AT & T CORP [US]) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * column 2, line 42 - column 8, line 16 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [X]WO9820411  (NEOMEDIA TECH INC [US]) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * page 9, line 22 - page 10, line 20 * * page 11, line 27 - page 12, line 14 * * figures 1,3 *;
 [X]GB2296414  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1-14 * figures 1-6 * * page 6, line 12 - line 21 * * page 8, line 5 - line 11 * * page 8, line 26 - page 10, line 13 * * page 11, line 8 - line 11 * * page 13, line 10 - line 22 * * page 18, line 3 - line 10 * * page 23, line 4 - line 26 *;
 [X]US5331547  (LASZLO GEORGE [US]) [X] 1-14 * figures 1a,2 * * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 47 *;
 [X]  - "GRAPHIC CODED ICON", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, (199611), vol. 39, no. 11, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 99 - 101, XP000679834 [X] 1-14 * page 99, paragraph L * * page 101, paragraph F *