Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969048

EP0969048 - Polymer composition [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.01.2005
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dow Corning Corporation
Midland, Michigan 48611 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
Dow Corning Corporation
Midland, Michigan 48611 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Gerlach, Ernst
Maiglöckchenweg 23
55126 Mainz / DE
02 / Joseph, Edouard
Am Lotzenwald 26
65719 Hofheim / DE
03 / Kunz, Klaus
Portegieserweg 5A
55239 Gau-Odernheim / DE
04 / Zaulig, Dieter
Elbweg 6
01612 Leckwitz / DE
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Williams, Paul Edwin
Dow Corning Limited
Cardiff Road
Barry
South Glamorgan CF63 2YL
Wales / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Williams, Paul Edwin
Dow Corning Limited, Cardiff Road, Barry
South Glamorgan CF63 2YL, Wales / GB
Application number, filing date99305203.401.07.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateGB1998001421201.07.1998         Original published format: GB 9814212
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0969048
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0969048
Date:24.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:C08L81/02, C08K5/54, C08L83/04
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/01]
TitleGerman:Polymer Zusammensetzung[2000/01]
English:Polymer composition[2000/01]
French:Composition de polymères[2000/01]
Examination procedure11.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/38]
11.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.03.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
03.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.12.2003Fee for grant paid
12.12.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.12.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/11]
Request for further processing for:03.04.2003Request for further processing filed
03.04.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
16.04.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
17.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
10.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
04.07.2000AT   M01   Fee paid on   11.07.2000
04.07.2000BE   M01   Fee paid on   11.07.2000
04.07.2000CH   M01   Fee paid on   11.07.2000
04.07.2000CY   M01   Fee paid on   11.07.2000
04.07.2000DE   M01   Fee paid on   11.07.2000
04.07.2000DK   M01   Fee paid on   11.07.2000
04.07.2000ES   M01   Fee paid on   11.07.2000
04.07.2000FI   M01   Fee paid on   11.07.2000
04.07.2000FR   M01   Fee paid on   11.07.2000
04.07.2000GB   M01   Fee paid on   11.07.2000
04.07.2000GR   M01   Fee paid on   11.07.2000
04.07.2000IE   M01   Fee paid on   11.07.2000
04.07.2000IT   M01   Fee paid on   11.07.2000
04.07.2000LU   M01   Fee paid on   11.07.2000
04.07.2000MC   M01   Fee paid on   11.07.2000
04.07.2000NL   M01   Fee paid on   11.07.2000
04.07.2000PT   M01   Fee paid on   11.07.2000
04.07.2000SE   M01   Fee paid on   11.07.2000
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
04.07.2000M01   Fee paid on   11.07.2000
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT24.03.2004
BE24.03.2004
CH24.03.2004
CY24.03.2004
FI24.03.2004
LI24.03.2004
NL24.03.2004
DK24.06.2004
GR24.06.2004
SE24.06.2004
IE01.07.2004
LU01.07.2004
ES05.07.2004
MC31.07.2004
PT24.08.2004
[2008/17]
Former [2007/21]AT24.03.2004
BE24.03.2004
CH24.03.2004
CY24.03.2004
FI24.03.2004
LI24.03.2004
NL24.03.2004
DK24.06.2004
GR24.06.2004
SE24.06.2004
IE01.07.2004
LU01.07.2004
ES05.07.2004
MC31.07.2004
Former [2006/13]AT24.03.2004
BE24.03.2004
CH24.03.2004
FI24.03.2004
LI24.03.2004
NL24.03.2004
DK24.06.2004
GR24.06.2004
SE24.06.2004
IE01.07.2004
LU01.07.2004
ES05.07.2004
MC31.07.2004
Former [2005/24]AT24.03.2004
BE24.03.2004
CH24.03.2004
FI24.03.2004
LI24.03.2004
DK24.06.2004
GR24.06.2004
SE24.06.2004
IE01.07.2004
LU01.07.2004
ES05.07.2004
MC31.07.2004
Former [2005/23]AT24.03.2004
BE24.03.2004
CH24.03.2004
FI24.03.2004
LI24.03.2004
DK24.06.2004
GR24.06.2004
SE24.06.2004
LU01.07.2004
ES05.07.2004
MC31.07.2004
Former [2005/22]AT24.03.2004
BE24.03.2004
CH24.03.2004
FI24.03.2004
LI24.03.2004
DK24.06.2004
GR24.06.2004
SE24.06.2004
ES05.07.2004
MC31.07.2004
Former [2005/18]AT24.03.2004
BE24.03.2004
CH24.03.2004
FI24.03.2004
LI24.03.2004
DK24.06.2004
GR24.06.2004
SE24.06.2004
ES05.07.2004
Former [2005/02]AT24.03.2004
BE24.03.2004
CH24.03.2004
FI24.03.2004
LI24.03.2004
GR24.06.2004
SE24.06.2004
ES05.07.2004
Former [2005/01]AT24.03.2004
BE24.03.2004
CH24.03.2004
FI24.03.2004
LI24.03.2004
GR24.06.2004
SE24.06.2004
Former [2004/51]AT24.03.2004
CH24.03.2004
FI24.03.2004
LI24.03.2004
GR24.06.2004
SE24.06.2004
Former [2004/43]AT24.03.2004
FI24.03.2004
GR24.06.2004
SE24.06.2004
Former [2004/41]FI24.03.2004
GR24.06.2004
SE24.06.2004
Former [2004/40]FI24.03.2004
SE24.06.2004
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0653472  (DOW CORNING TORAY SILICONE [JP]) [X] 9-11 * claims 2,3,7 *;
 [X]EP0286257  (POLYPLASTICS CO [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * claim - *;
 [X]EP0302648  (POLYPLASTICS CO [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * claims 1-8 *;
 [X]EP0369244  (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]) [X] 1-8 * claim - *;
 [X]EP0601781  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-8 * claim - *