Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974328

EP0974328 - Rotating infant mattress [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.12.2006
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.12.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.01.2007  [2007/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Datex-Ohmeda Inc.
Ohmeda Drive Madison
Wisconsin 53707-7550 / US
[2006/06]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Datex-Ohmeda Inc.
Ohmeda Drive
Madison, Wisconsin 53707-7550 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Dykes, Christopher A.
2276 Canteen Circle
Odenton, Maryland 21113 / US
02 / Poling, John B.
14501 Thornton Mills Road
Sparks, Maryland 21152 / US
03 / Jones, Thomas C.
5329 Lightning View Road
Columbia, Maryland 21045 / US
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Hedley, Nicholas James Matthew , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lancon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Hedley, Nicholas James Matthew , et al
Stephenson Harwood One, St. Paul's Churchyard
London EC4M 8SH / GB
Application number, filing date99305284.402.07.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateUS1998011946920.07.1998         Original published format: US 119469
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0974328
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0974328
Date:20.09.2000
[2000/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974328
Date:08.02.2006
Language:EN
[2006/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61G11/00
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/23]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Drehbare Matratze für Kinder[2000/04]
English:Rotating infant mattress[2000/04]
French:Matelas rotatif pour enfant[2000/04]
Examination procedure16.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/20]
06.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.07.2005Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.08.2005
26.07.2005Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
02.08.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.08.2005Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
30.11.2005Fee for grant paid
30.11.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP06075180.7  / EP1658835
Opposition(s)09.11.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
22.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
20.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[AD]DE1239060  (DRAEGERWERK AG) [AD] 1,6,11 * column 2, line 20 - line 27; figure - *;
 [A]US5730355  (LESSARD JOSEPH J [US], et al) [A] 2 * column 2, line 9 - line 12; figure 1 *;
 [XA]GB947617  (OXYGENAIRE LONDON LTD) [X] 11 * page 2, line 83 - line 90; figure - * [A] 12;
 [A]US3335713  (GROSHOLZ JAMES R, et al) [A] 15 * column 4, line 65 - line 71; figure - *;
 [E]EP0931534  (DATEX OHMEDA INC [US]) [E] 1 * column 5, line 45 - line 50; figure - *
by applicantDE1239060
 US4936824
 US4628553