Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969118

EP0969118 - Surface hardening of resins [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.04.2006
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip07.04.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.05.2006  [2006/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
AGENCY OF INDUSTRIAL SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY
3-1, Kasumigaseki 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
SONY CORPORATION
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
AGENCY OF INDUSTRIAL SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY
3-1, Kasumigaseki 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tonosaki, Minehiro
c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Takei, Yutaka
c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
03 / Okita, Hiroyuki
c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
04 / Horino, Yuji c/o Osaka National Research Inst.
Agency of Ind. Science & Techn., 8-31 Midorigaoka
1-chome, Kieda-shi, Osaka-fu / JP
05 / Chayahara, Akiyoshi Osaka National Research Inst.
Agency of Ind. Science & Techn., 8-31 Midorigaoka
1-chome, Kieda-shi, Osaka-fu / JP
06 / Kinomura, Atsushi Osaka National Research Inst.
Agency of Ind. Science & Techn., 8-31 Midorigaoka
1-chome, Ikeda-shi, Osaka-fu / JP
07 / Tsubouchi, Nobuteru Osaka National Research Inst.
Agency of Ind. Science & Techn., 8-31 Midorigaoka
1-chome, Ikeda-shi, Osaka-fu / JP
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Goddard, Frances Anna
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/47]Goddard, Frances Anna
D Young & Co 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Former [2000/26]Boden, Keith McMurray , et al
D. Young & Co. 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Former [2000/01]Purvis, William Michael Cameron
D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date99305292.702.07.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateJP1998018920803.07.1998         Original published format: JP 18920898
JP1999000404911.01.1999         Original published format: JP 404999
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0969118
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0969118
Date:06.08.2003
[2003/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.06.2003
ClassificationInternational:C23C14/48, C23C14/02, B29C59/16
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesFR,   GB [2004/18]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Oberflächenhärtung von Harzen[2000/01]
English:Surface hardening of resins[2000/01]
French:Durcissement de la surface de résines[2000/01]
Examination procedure23.01.2004Examination requested  [2004/13]
12.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.10.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/21]
05.12.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
13.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
13.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200204   M06   Fee paid on   13.11.2002
Documents cited:Search[X]US5474797  (BARRY JOHN E ET AL) [X] 12,13,15,16,32,33,35-40,42,43,45-48 * column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 50; figure 2; example 4; claims 1-7 *;
 [X]EP0319872  (POLAROID CORP) [X] 1,5,6,9,12,17,32,39,42,47 * column 5, line 25 - column 7, line 38; figure 1 *;
 [X]US4395465  (TAKAGI TOSHINORI ET AL) [X] 1,2,4,9,10,20,21,24,27,30-36,39,40,50,51,54,55,57,59 * column 2, line 11 - line 19; example .; claim - *;
 [X]US4751100  (OGAWA KAZUFUMI) [X] 1,9,10,20,24,25,27,30,31,50,54,55,57,59 * column 2, line 39 - column 5, line 51 *