blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0971391

EP0971391 - A method for reducing particles from an electrostatic chuck [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/02]A method for reducing particles from an electrostatic chuck and an equipment for manufacturing a semiconductor
[2005/15]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.08.2006
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip04.08.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.09.2006  [2006/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NGK Insulators, Ltd.
2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-City, Aichi Pref. 467-8530 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2005/39]For all designated states
NGK INSULATORS, LTD.
2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-City, Aichi Pref. 467-8530 / JP
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
NGK INSULATORS, LTD.
2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-City, Aichi Prefecture 467-8530 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nagao, Mie
Rinkaisou A-104, 48-1, Aza-Yomoda, Ohkusa
Chita City, Aichi Pref. / JP
02 / Ushikoshi, Ryusuke
8-8, Motomachi 4-chome
Tajimi City, Gifu Pref. / JP
03 / Ohno, Masashi, NGK Takeda-Minami-Shataku 106
15, Takeda-cho 2-chome, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya City, Aichi Pref. / JP
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date99305306.505.07.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateJP1998019035006.07.1998         Original published format: JP 19035098
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0971391
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0971391
Date:02.10.2002
[2002/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0971391
Date:28.09.2005
Language:EN
[2005/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.08.2002
ClassificationIPC:H01L21/00, H01L21/68
[2002/40]
CPC:
G03F7/70691 (EP,US); H01L21/68 (KR); H01L21/6833 (EP,US);
H02N13/00 (EP,US); Y10T279/23 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2000/02]H01L21/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/26]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Verminderung von Teilchen von einem elektrostatischen Halter[2005/15]
English:A method for reducing particles from an electrostatic chuck[2005/15]
French:Méthode pour limiter les particules d'un support électrostatique[2005/15]
Former [2000/02]Verfahren zur Verminderung von Teilchen von einem elektrostatischen Halter und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung eines Halbleiters
Former [2000/02]A method for reducing particles from an electrostatic chuck and an equipment for manufacturing a semiconductor
Former [2000/02]Méthode pour limiter les particules d'un support électrostatique et équipement pour la fabrication de semiconducteurs
Examination procedure06.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/19]
22.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.03.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.07.2005Fee for grant paid
08.07.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.06.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
22.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
23.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
22.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XAY]JPH08191098  ;
 [XA]US5325261  (HORWITZ CHRISTOPHER M [AU]) [X] 8 * abstract * * column 9, lines 1-39 * [A] 1,9-14;
 [XA]EP0644578  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 10,13 * abstract * [A] 1,8,9,11,12,14;
 [XA]JPH1014266  ;
 US6084763  [ ] (HIRANO SHINSUKE [JP], et al) [ ] * column 2, lines 35-60 *;
 [YA]EP0725427  (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [Y] 9 * column 5, lines 9-15 * [A] 1,8,10-14;
 [A]US5612850  (BIRANG MANOOCHER [US], et al) [A] 1,8-14 * column 5, lines 41-61 *;
 [A]WO9613058  (DIAMOND SEMICONDUCTOR GROUP [US]) [A] 1,8-14 * abstract * * page 12, lines 4-15 *;
 [A]US5746928  (YEN SHIH KUEI [TW], et al) [A] 1,8-14 * abstract *;
 [A]JPH08316297  ;
 [E]JPH11251418
 [XAY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961129), vol. 1996, no. 11, & JP08191098 A 19960723 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 8,10 * abstract * [A] 1,11-14 [Y] 9
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 1998, no. 05, & JP10014266 A 19980116 (SONY CORP) [X] 11,12,14 * abstract * [A] 1,8-10,13
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970331), vol. 1997, no. 03, & JP08316297 A 19961129 (SONY CORP) [A] 1,8-14 * abstract *
 [E]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991222), vol. 1999, no. 14, & JP11251418 A 19990917 (ULVAC CORP) [E] 10 * abstract *
ExaminationEP0798773
 JPH04206546
 JPS62110127
    - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921110), vol. 016, no. 539, Database accession no. (E - 1289), & JP04206546 A 19920728 (HITACHI LTD)
    - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871022), vol. 011, no. 324, Database accession no. (P - 628), & JP62110127 A 19870521 (KOYO RINDOBAAGU KK)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.