blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0972714

EP0972714 - Plastic container with drain back spout and method and apparatus for making same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.08.2006
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Graham Packaging Plastic Products Inc.
One SeaGate
Toledo, OH 43666 / US
[2005/31]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
Owens-Brockway Plastic Products Inc.
One SeaGate
Toledo, OH 43666 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Geisinger, Gregory A.
2340 Gradwohl Road
Toledo, OH 43617 / US
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/41]Carpmaels & Ransford
One Southampton Row London
WC1B 5HA / GB
Former [2002/40]Carpmaels & Ransford
43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [2001/12]Carpmael, John William Maurice, et al
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London, WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [2000/03]Votier, Sidney David
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date99305313.105.07.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateUS1998011448113.07.1998         Original published format: US 114481
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0972714
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0972714
Date:17.04.2002
[2002/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0972714
Date:19.10.2005
Language:EN
[2005/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.02.2002
ClassificationIPC:B65D23/06, B29C45/26, B29C49/02, B65D47/12
[2002/16]
CPC:
B65D47/122 (EP,US); B29C45/2618 (EP,US); B65D23/06 (EP,US);
B29C2949/072 (EP,US); B29C2949/0722 (EP,US); B29C2949/073 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0731 (EP,US); B29C2949/0775 (EP,US); B29C2949/0778 (EP,US);
B29C2949/079 (EP); B29C2949/0794 (EP,US); B29C2949/3032 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3041 (EP,US); B29C49/071 (EP,US); B29L2001/00 (EP,US);
B29L2031/7158 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2000/03]B65D23/06, B29C45/26
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/03]
TitleGerman:Kunststoffbehälter mit Rückflussaussgiesser, Verfahren und Vorrichtung zu seiner Herstellung[2000/03]
English:Plastic container with drain back spout and method and apparatus for making same[2000/03]
French:Récipient en plastique avec bec verseur ayant un drain de retour, procédé et appareil pour sa fabrication[2000/03]
Examination procedure25.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/39]
16.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.11.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.05.2005Fee for grant paid
27.05.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.07.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
04.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
04.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
09.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
13.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.10.2005
BE19.10.2005
CH19.10.2005
CY19.10.2005
FI19.10.2005
IT19.10.2005
LI19.10.2005
NL19.10.2005
DK19.01.2006
GR19.01.2006
SE19.01.2006
ES30.01.2006
PT20.03.2006
GB05.07.2006
IE05.07.2006
LU05.07.2006
[2009/02]
Former [2008/36]AT19.10.2005
BE19.10.2005
CH19.10.2005
FI19.10.2005
IT19.10.2005
LI19.10.2005
NL19.10.2005
DK19.01.2006
GR19.01.2006
SE19.01.2006
ES30.01.2006
PT20.03.2006
GB05.07.2006
IE05.07.2006
LU05.07.2006
Former [2008/17]AT19.10.2005
BE19.10.2005
CH19.10.2005
FI19.10.2005
IT19.10.2005
LI19.10.2005
NL19.10.2005
DK19.01.2006
GR19.01.2006
SE19.01.2006
ES30.01.2006
PT20.03.2006
GB05.07.2006
IE05.07.2006
Former [2007/30]AT19.10.2005
BE19.10.2005
CH19.10.2005
FI19.10.2005
LI19.10.2005
NL19.10.2005
DK19.01.2006
GR19.01.2006
SE19.01.2006
ES30.01.2006
PT20.03.2006
GB05.07.2006
IE05.07.2006
Former [2006/50]AT19.10.2005
BE19.10.2005
CH19.10.2005
FI19.10.2005
LI19.10.2005
NL19.10.2005
DK19.01.2006
GR19.01.2006
SE19.01.2006
ES30.01.2006
PT20.03.2006
Former [2006/38]AT19.10.2005
BE19.10.2005
CH19.10.2005
FI19.10.2005
LI19.10.2005
NL19.10.2005
DK19.01.2006
GR19.01.2006
SE19.01.2006
PT20.03.2006
Former [2006/36]AT19.10.2005
BE19.10.2005
CH19.10.2005
FI19.10.2005
LI19.10.2005
NL19.10.2005
DK19.01.2006
SE19.01.2006
PT20.03.2006
Former [2006/34]AT19.10.2005
CH19.10.2005
FI19.10.2005
LI19.10.2005
NL19.10.2005
DK19.01.2006
SE19.01.2006
PT20.03.2006
Former [2006/33]CH19.10.2005
FI19.10.2005
LI19.10.2005
NL19.10.2005
SE19.01.2006
PT20.03.2006
Former [2006/27]FI19.10.2005
NL19.10.2005
SE19.01.2006
PT20.03.2006
Former [2006/25]FI19.10.2005
NL19.10.2005
PT20.03.2006
Former [2006/24]FI19.10.2005
NL19.10.2005
Documents cited:Search[A]US4941815  (JULIAN RANDALL K [US]) [A] 1-16 * column W *;
 [A]EP0378047  (CLAROPAC AG [CH]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [AD]US4989757  (KRALL THOMAS J [US]) [AD] 1-16 * column W *;
 [A]EP0532473  (SOPLAR SA [CH]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5435467  (EKKERT LEN [US], et al) [A] 1-7* column W *
by applicantUS2804654
 US4989757
 US5114659
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.