blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0972614

EP0972614 - Internal combustion fastener driving tool accelerator plate [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.07.2002
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.08.2002  [2002/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Porter-Cable Corporation
4825 Highway 45 North, P.O. Box 2468 Jackson
Tennessee 38302-2468 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
Porter-Cable Corporation
4825 Highway 45 North, P.O. Box 2468
Jackson, Tennessee 38302-2468 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Phillips, Alan
200 Willow Green Drive
Jackson, Tennessee 38305 / US
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Pawlyn, Anthony Neil
Murgitroyd & Company Cardiff
Churchill House
Churchill Way
Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Pawlyn, Anthony Neil
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, Tower House, Merrion Way
Leeds, West Yorkshire LS2 8PA / GB
Application number, filing date99305326.305.07.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateUS1998011486213.07.1998         Original published format: US 114862
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0972614
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0972614
Date:02.05.2001
[2001/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.03.2001
ClassificationIPC:B25C1/08, B25C1/00
[2000/03]
CPC:
B25C1/005 (EP,US); B25C1/08 (EP,US)
Designated contracting states[2002/04]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Bechleunigungsplatte für verbrennungskraftbetriebens Setzgerät[2000/03]
English:Internal combustion fastener driving tool accelerator plate[2000/03]
French:Outil entraîné par un gaz de combustion pour enfoncer des attaches avec plaque d'accélération[2000/03]
Examination procedure01.02.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/34]
14.03.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/34]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
02.01.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
02.01.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
02.01.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
02.01.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
02.01.2002DE   M01   Not yet paid
02.01.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
02.01.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
02.01.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
02.01.2002FR   M01   Not yet paid
02.01.2002GB   M01   Not yet paid
02.01.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
02.01.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
02.01.2002IT   M01   Not yet paid
02.01.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
02.01.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
02.01.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
02.01.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
02.01.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
02.01.2002M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200103   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XA]US4773581  (OHTSU SHINKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 1, lines 53-57 * * column 2, lines 29-65 * * column 3, lines 26-35 * * column 7, lines 46-60 * [A] 17-19;
 [DA]US4365471  (ADAMS JOSEPH S) [DA] 1-3,11,14,17-19 * column 6, line 55 - column 8, line 23; figures 7,11 *;
 [DA]US4712379  (ADAMS JOSEPH S [CA], et al) [DA] 1-3,14,19 * column 2, line 4 - column 4, line 18; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]EP0424941  (HITACHI KOKI KK [JP]) [A] 1-3,10 * column 6, line 32 - column 7, line 5; figure 1 *
by applicantUS4365471
 US4510748
 US4712379
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.