Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972532

EP0972532 - Drip chamber for medical fluid delivery system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  18.10.2002
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2002Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 04.12.2002  [2002/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Urrutia, Hector
1801 South 5th Street, Suite 102 McAllen
Texas 78593 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
Urrutia, Hector
1801 South 5th Street, Suite 102
McAllen, Texas 78593 / US
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Skone James, Robert Edmund
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Skone James, Robert Edmund
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date99305362.806.07.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateUS1998011564015.07.1998         Original published format: US 115640
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0972532
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61M5/14, A61M5/36
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/03]
TitleGerman:Tropfkammer für eine Vorrichtung zum Verabreichen von medizinischen Flüssigkeiten[2000/03]
English:Drip chamber for medical fluid delivery system[2000/03]
French:Dispositif de chambre goutte à goutte pour l'administration de fluides médicaux[2000/03]
Examination procedure06.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/35]
09.10.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2002/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5575779  (BARRY ROBERT L [US]) [X] 1,3,5 * column 4, line 14 - line 57 * * figures 3,6 * [Y] 2,4,6,7;
 [Y]US5776109  (URRUTIA HECTOR [US]) [Y] 2,4,6,7 * column 3, line 14 - line 20 * * abstract *;
 [A]EP0147025  (GOULD INC [US]) [A] 1-3,9,10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5045096  (QUANG MINH B [DE], et al) [A] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US3521635  (KOEHN WILBUR R) [A] 1 * figure - *
by applicantUS19960701874