blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0970926 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0970926



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 133
13.04.2005 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
29.04.2004 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
23.04.2004 Approval of request for amendments/corrections Search / examination 1
19.04.2004 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
19.04.2004 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations Search / examination 2
13.04.2004 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
29.03.2004 Reply to communication about intention to grant Search / examination 1
29.03.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
29.03.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
02.02.2004 Notice concerning a request for amendments/ corrections Search / examination 1
22.01.2004 Claims Search / examination 2
22.01.2004 Description Search / examination 2
22.01.2004 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 2
26.11.2003 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
26.11.2003 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
26.11.2003 Text intended for grant Search / examination 13
23.05.2003 Claims Search / examination 3
23.05.2003 Description Search / examination 5
23.05.2003 Description Search / examination 4
23.05.2003 Drawings Search / examination 1
23.05.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
05.02.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
05.02.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.01.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
01.12.1999 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
29.10.1999 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
29.10.1999 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
29.10.1999 European search report Search / examination 1
22.07.1999 Drawings Search / examination 2
22.07.1999 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
22.07.1999 Priority document Search / examination 20
06.07.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
06.07.1999 Claims Search / examination 3
06.07.1999 Description Search / examination 8
06.07.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
06.07.1999 Drawings Search / examination 2
06.07.1999 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 2
06.07.1999 Priority document Search / examination 20
06.07.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7