blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0970926


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
21.03.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.04.2008  [2008/17]
20.04.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.05.2007  [2007/21]
10.02.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.03.2006  [2006/13]
29.04.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.06.2005  [2005/24]
15.04.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.06.2005  [2005/22]
15.04.2005 No opposition filed within time limit published on  01.06.2005  [2005/22]
18.02.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.04.2005  [2005/14]
28.01.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.03.2005  [2005/11]
24.12.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.02.2005  [2005/06]
26.11.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.01.2005  [2005/02]
05.11.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.12.2004  [2004/52]
29.10.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.12.2004  [2004/51]
23.04.2004 (Expected) grant published on  09.06.2004  [2004/24]
09.04.2004 Change - applicant published on  26.05.2004  [2004/22]
08.04.2004 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
08.04.2004 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
14.11.2003 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
24.07.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.05.2003 Examination report or reply
07.02.2003 First examination report
01.02.2003 Examination report or reply
24.07.2002 Renewal fee
20.07.2001 Renewal fee
02.10.2000 Change - extension states
11.08.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  27.09.2000 [2000/39]
14.07.2000 Request for examination filed published on  30.08.2000 [2000/35]
26.11.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.01.2000 [2000/02]