blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0970926
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2000053439Global Dossier 22.02.2000A
Priority number Date
GB9814842 08.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0970926Global Dossier 09.06.2004B1
EP0970926 12.01.2000A1
Priority number Date
GB9814842 08.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AR024195 25.09.2002A1
Priority number Date
GB9814842 08.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT268740T 15.06.2004T
Priority number Date
GB9814842 08.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AU749925B 04.07.2002B2
AU3912099 03.02.2000A
Priority number Date
GB9814842 08.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
BR9902785 18.04.2000A
Priority number Date
GB9814842 08.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CA2277416 08.01.2000A1
Priority number Date
GB9814842 08.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1147442C 28.04.2004C
CN1244506 16.02.2000A
Priority number Date
GB9814842 08.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69917836T 14.07.2005T2
DE69917836D 15.07.2004D1
Priority number Date
GB9814842 08.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2223157T 16.02.2005T3
Priority number Date
GB9814842 08.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
GB2339195 19.01.2000A
GB9814842D 09.09.1998D0
Priority number Date
GB9814842 08.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
NZ336645 29.09.2000A
Priority number Date
GB9814842 08.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
RU2209784 10.08.2003C2
Priority number Date
GB9814842 08.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6508113 21.01.2003B1
Priority number Date
GB9814842 08.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ZA9904410 10.01.2000B
Priority number Date
GB9814842 08.07.1998