Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970926

EP0970926 - Producing optical fibre [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.04.2005
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PIRELLI GENERAL plc
15 Grosvenor Street
London W1K 4QZ / GB
[2004/22]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
PIRELLI GENERAL plc
11 Berkeley Street
London W1X 6BU / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Rogerson, John William
54 The Maples
Harlow, Essex CM19 4QZ / GB
02 / Davies, Paul Alexander
73 Brook Road
Stansted Mountfitchet, Essex CM24 8BB / GB
03 / Hadley, John Alfred
54 Altham Grove
Harlow, Essex CM20 2PH / GB
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Abbie, Andrew Kenneth , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Abbie, Andrew Kenneth , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date99305373.506.07.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateGB1998001484208.07.1998         Original published format: GB 9814842
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970926
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970926
Date:09.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:C03B37/03, B65H65/00, B65H54/86
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/02]
TitleGerman:Herstellung optischer Fasern[2000/02]
English:Producing optical fibre[2000/02]
French:Production de fibre optique[2000/02]
Examination procedure06.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/35]
05.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.03.2004Fee for grant paid
29.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT09.06.2004
BE09.06.2004
CH09.06.2004
CY09.06.2004
FI09.06.2004
LI09.06.2004
NL09.06.2004
IE06.07.2004
LU06.07.2004
MC31.07.2004
DK09.09.2004
GR09.09.2004
SE09.09.2004
PT09.11.2004
[2008/17]
Former [2007/21]AT09.06.2004
BE09.06.2004
CH09.06.2004
CY09.06.2004
FI09.06.2004
LI09.06.2004
NL09.06.2004
IE06.07.2004
LU06.07.2004
MC31.07.2004
DK09.09.2004
GR09.09.2004
SE09.09.2004
Former [2006/13]AT09.06.2004
BE09.06.2004
CH09.06.2004
FI09.06.2004
LI09.06.2004
NL09.06.2004
IE06.07.2004
MC31.07.2004
DK09.09.2004
GR09.09.2004
SE09.09.2004
Former [2005/24]AT09.06.2004
BE09.06.2004
CH09.06.2004
FI09.06.2004
LI09.06.2004
IE06.07.2004
MC31.07.2004
DK09.09.2004
GR09.09.2004
SE09.09.2004
Former [2005/22]AT09.06.2004
BE09.06.2004
CH09.06.2004
FI09.06.2004
LI09.06.2004
MC31.07.2004
DK09.09.2004
GR09.09.2004
SE09.09.2004
Former [2005/14]AT09.06.2004
BE09.06.2004
CH09.06.2004
FI09.06.2004
LI09.06.2004
GR09.09.2004
SE09.09.2004
Former [2005/11]AT09.06.2004
CH09.06.2004
FI09.06.2004
LI09.06.2004
GR09.09.2004
SE09.09.2004
Former [2005/06]CH09.06.2004
FI09.06.2004
LI09.06.2004
GR09.09.2004
SE09.09.2004
Former [2005/02]CH09.06.2004
FI09.06.2004
LI09.06.2004
SE09.09.2004
Former [2004/52]CH09.06.2004
LI09.06.2004
SE09.09.2004
Former [2004/51]CH09.06.2004
LI09.06.2004
Documents cited:Search[XA]JPS6469537  ;
 [A]JPS6469536  ;
 [A]JPS63112376  ;
 [A]JPS63170238  ;
 [A]US4511095  (IDENO EIZO [JP], et al) [A] 1,7 * column 6, line 11 - line 31; figure - *;
 [A]US4062501  (EISENBERG ARNOLD J, et al);
 [A]GB2276367  (TAGSA LIMITED [GB])
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890622), vol. 013, no. 273, Database accession no. (C - 609), [X] 1,2,4 * abstract * [A] 7
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890622), vol. 013, no. 273, Database accession no. (C - 609), [A] 1,2,4,7 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880926), vol. 012, no. 356, Database accession no. (M - 745), [A] 1,7 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881124), vol. 012, no. 446, Database accession no. (C - 546), [A] * abstract *