blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0971062


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
16.09.2005 No opposition filed within time limit published on  02.11.2005  [2005/44]
24.09.2004 (Expected) grant published on  10.11.2004  [2004/46]
17.09.2004 Change - applicant published on  03.11.2004  [2004/45]
10.09.2004 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
10.09.2004 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
16.07.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.04.2004 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
02.04.2004 New entry: Reply to examination report
05.12.2003 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
07.11.2003 New entry: Reply to examination report
16.07.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.07.2003 First examination report
02.07.2003 New entry: Examination report or reply
29.04.2003 Loss of particular rights
27.02.2003 Change - extension states
14.01.2003 Loss of particular rights
29.11.2002 Change - designated states published on  15.01.2003  [2003/03]
25.11.2002 Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973)
01.11.2002 Definitive list of designations published on  18.12.2002  [2002/51]
29.10.2002 Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973)
21.09.2002 Request for examination filed published on  06.11.2002  [2002/45]
17.09.2002 Amendment by applicant
17.07.2002 Renewal fee
08.02.2002 Publication of search report published on  27.03.2002  [2002/13]
18.07.2001 Renewal fee
23.06.2000 Change or deletion - publication of search report published on  23.06.2000 [2000/32]
24.03.2000 Publication of search report published on  10.05.2000 [2000/19]
10.03.2000 Change - German title published on  26.04.2000 [2000/17]
26.11.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.01.2000 [2000/02]