blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0971062

Designated contracting states DE 
 DK 
 FR 
 GB 
 IT 
Examination procedure31.08.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
06.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
04.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
06.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
04.11.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
04.11.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
04.11.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
04.11.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
04.11.2002DE   M01   Fee paid on   15.11.2002
04.11.2002DK   M01   Fee paid on   15.11.2002
04.11.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
04.11.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
04.11.2002FR   M01   Fee paid on   15.11.2002
04.11.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
04.11.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
04.11.2002IT   M01   Fee paid on   15.11.2002
04.11.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
04.11.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
04.11.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
04.11.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
04.11.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
European patent granted10.11.2004
Opposition procedure11.08.2005No opposition filed within time limit published on 26.10.2005 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:12.01.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):DE DK FR GB IT
 
Event date:12.01.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:12.01.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:10.05.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:10.05.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:09.08.2000 
Event description:DEFERRED SEARCH REPORT PUBLISHED (DELETED)
 
Event date:27.03.2002 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:06.11.2002 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20020828
 
Event date:18.12.2002 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Free Format Text:GB
 
Event date:15.01.2003 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTED)
Designated State(s):DE DK FR GB IT
 
Event date:20.08.2003 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20030704
 
Event date:03.11.2004 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:WEIR, HENRY JOHN
 
Event date:03.11.2004 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:WEIR, HENRY JOHN
 
Event date:10.11.2004 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE DK FR GB IT
 
Event date:10.11.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:15.12.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:16.12.2004 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69921741
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20041216
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:21.02.2005 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK T3
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS
 
Event date:02.11.2005 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20050811
 
Event date:11.11.2005 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:30.06.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:30.06.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:10.09.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.10.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20180706
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.10.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20180725
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.10.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20180910
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.11.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Payment DATE:20180717
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.11.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20180702
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:07.07.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R071 69921741 DE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF RIGHT
 
Event date:08.07.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK EUP
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT EXPIRED
Effective DATE:20190707
 
Event date:31.07.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB PE20
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS
Expiry DATE:20190706