Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971062

EP0971062 - Apparatus for separating laundry articles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.09.2005
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.09.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.11.2005  [2005/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Weir, Henry John
The Willows Woodcroft Close Woodcroft Chepstow
Monmouthshire NP6 7HX / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/45]For all designated states
Weir, Henry John
The Willows Woodcroft Close
Woodcroft Chepstow Monmouthshire NP6 7HX / GB
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
Weir, Henry John
The Willows Woodcroft Close
Woodcroft Chepstow Gwent / GB
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Marles, Alan David
Stevens Hewlett & Perkins
1 St Augustine's Place
Bristol BS1 4UD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Marles, Alan David
Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St Augustine's Place
Bristol BS1 4UD / GB
Application number, filing date99305412.107.07.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateGB1998001479608.07.1998         Original published format: GB 9814796
GB1998002171306.10.1998         Original published format: GB 9821713
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0971062
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0971062
Date:27.03.2002
[2002/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0971062
Date:10.11.2004
Language:EN
[2004/46]
Former [2000/32]Type: A3  Search report
No.:EP0971062
Date:
Status:(deleted)
[2000/32]
[2002/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.02.2002
ClassificationInternational:D06F95/00, B65H3/22, B65G47/14, B65G47/52, B65G47/90, B65H5/02, B65H5/06, B65H5/22, D06F93/00
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/03]
Former [2002/51]GB 
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Vereinzeln von Wäschestücken[2000/02]
English:Apparatus for separating laundry articles[2000/02]
French:Dispositif pour séparer des pièces de linge[2000/02]
Examination procedure28.08.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/45]
28.09.2002Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
17.01.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
04.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.04.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.08.2004Fee for grant paid
31.08.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.08.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
06.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
04.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
06.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
04.11.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
04.11.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
04.11.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
04.11.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
04.11.2002DE   M01   Fee paid on   15.11.2002
04.11.2002DK   M01   Fee paid on   15.11.2002
04.11.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
04.11.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
04.11.2002FR   M01   Fee paid on   15.11.2002
04.11.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
04.11.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
04.11.2002IT   M01   Fee paid on   15.11.2002
04.11.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
04.11.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
04.11.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
04.11.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
04.11.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[YA]EP0848102  (KANNEGIESSER H GMBH CO [DE]) [Y] 1-3,6,7,10 * the whole document * [A] 18,27-29;
 [Y]EP0751251  (TOKAI CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-3,6,7,10 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPH07194900  ;
 [A]DE4330911  (KANNEGIESSER H GMBH CO [DE]) [A] 1,13,14,18-20 * abstract * * column 4, line 15 - column 5, line 15; figures 2,3 *;
 [A]WO9713914  (JENSEN EJNAR & SOEN AS [DK], et al) [A] 1,34-37 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5168645  (ROBIN FRANCOIS [FR], et al) [A] 1,10,12 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0737769  (DETEXOMAT MACHINERY LTD [GB]) [A] 1,8-11,15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4943198  (MCCABE STANLEY G [US]) [A] 1,18,19,21,22,27,28 * column 5, line 20 - line 27; figures 5-9 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951226), vol. 1995, no. 11, [A] 1,4,18,28,30 * abstract *