Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970771

EP0970771 - Jigsaw blade clamping system with cam-operated clamping member [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.01.2003
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.02.2003  [2003/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Porter-Cable Corporation
4825 Highway 45 North, P.O. Box 2468 Jackson
Tennessee 38302-2468 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
Porter-Cable Corporation
4825 Highway 45 North, P.O. Box 2468
Jackson, Tennessee 38302-2468 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Schnell, John W.
208 Candlewood Cove
Jackson, Tennessee 38305 / US
02 / Wall, Daniel P.
14 Blackmon Road
Humboldt, Tennessee 38343 / US
03 / Bosten, Donald R.
439 Old Bells Road
Jackson, Tennessee 38305 / US
04 / Stolzer, James T.
4060 Garmany Road
Milan, Tennessee 38358 / US
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Pawlyn, Anthony Neil
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Arena Point
Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Pawlyn, Anthony Neil
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, Tower House, Merrion Way
Leeds, West Yorkshire LS2 8PA / GB
Application number, filing date99305422.008.07.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateUS1998011386510.07.1998         Original published format: US 113865
US1998011343210.07.1998         Original published format: US 113432
US1998011339410.07.1998         Original published format: US 113394
US1998011323510.07.1998         Original published format: US 113235
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0970771
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0970771
Date:03.05.2000
[2000/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:B23D51/10, B23D51/02, B23D49/16, B23D59/00
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/02]
TitleGerman:Stichsägeblattspannvorrichtung mit nockenbetätigtem Spannelement[2000/02]
English:Jigsaw blade clamping system with cam-operated clamping member[2000/02]
French:Dispositif de serrage de lame de scie sauteuse à élément de serrage actionné par came[2000/02]
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
03.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/01]
31.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.02.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
23.08.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/09]
26.09.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/09]
Request for further processing for:18.02.2002Request for further processing filed
18.02.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
18.03.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]GB2069406  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [X] 1,2,6,9,14,20 * page 1, line 80 - line 93 * * page 1, line 109 - page 2, line 7 * * figure - * [A] 11,17,19;
 [XAY]JPH07266129  ;
 [Y]EP0544129  (ATLAS COPCO ELEKTROWERKZEUGE [DE]) [Y] 13 * column 5, line 42 - line 51 * * figures 2,4 *;
 [A]DE4313718  (HOESCHELE BERND [DE])
 [XAY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960229), vol. 199, no. 602, [X] 1,3-10,14,15,17,18,20 * abstract * [A] 11,19 [Y] 13